Soriano v. Countrywide Homes Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Norilito Soriano
Defendant: Countrywide Homes Loans, Inc., Solidhomes Funding, Manuel Chavez, Mark Flores, Solidhomes Entrepreneurs, Inc. and Bank of America, Corp
Case Number: 5:2009cv02415
Filed: June 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Approving Parties' Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Filing Motion for Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/14/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/30/3011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Resolving Legal Issues Raised in Defendant's Trial Brief. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/2/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Further Case Management ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/27/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Quash. Opposition due May 25, 2011 by 5 p.m. No Reply. Motion will be heard at Pretrial Conference on May 27, 2011 at 10:30 a.m.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Regarding Trial Date. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/20/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 101 Ex Parte Application. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Addressing Additional Pretrial Issues. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/10/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 60 Ex Parte Application; denying 63 Ex Parte Application; denying 65 Motion to Strike. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Ordering Parties to Participate in Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/28/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Second Ex Parte Application. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/19/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application, Dkt. No. 60 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/14/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Extending Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/13/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Complete Mediation re 39 Stipulation. Mediation deadline set for 8/24/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/1/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 34 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 Case Management Statement.The Court VACATES the 10/19/2009 Case Management Conference. In its Orderaddressing the anticipated Motion to Dismiss, the Court will set a new Case Management Conference date, if necessary. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soriano v. Countrywide Homes Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norilito Soriano
Represented By: John Arthur Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Homes Loans, Inc.
Represented By: James Goldberg, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solidhomes Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Chavez
Represented By: Amiel Lee Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solidhomes Entrepreneurs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, Corp
Represented By: James Goldberg, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?