Alamillo v. Apple Computer Inc. Group Disability Plan, et al
Plaintiff: John Alamillo
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and Apple Computer Inc. Group Disability Plan
Case Number: 5:2009cv02597
Filed: June 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 16 Stipulation. The Clerk shall this this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER re 13 Joint Case Management Statement. The Court VACATES the 10/26/2009 Case Management Conference and ORDERS as follows:. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's request for discovery at this time. Motion Hearing re Cross Motions for Summary Judgment set for 6/7/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/20/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 10 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alamillo v. Apple Computer Inc. Group Disability Plan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alamillo
Represented By: Scott E. Shaffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Computer Inc. Group Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?