Hewlett-Packard Company, and Consolidated Subsidiaries v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Hewlett-Packard Company, and Consolidated Subsidiaries
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2009cv02882
Filed: June 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 26:6702 IRS: Refund of Income Tax Penalty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/18/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Directing Clerk to Administratively Close the Case. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/7/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE STAY. THE STAY CURRENTLY IN EFFECT SHALL LAST THROUGH MARCH 18, 2011. A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, MARCH 23, 2011 AT 2PM. Signed by Judge Koh on 10/13/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 15 ). Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose.Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/22/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewlett-Packard Company, and Consolidated Subsidiaries v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hewlett-Packard Company, and Consolidated Subsidiaries
Represented By: Beth Lee Urich Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?