Mendez -v- Intel Corporation
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Mendez
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Case Number: 5:2009cv02889
Filed: June 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge:
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time Regarding Discovery Responses and Motions re 177 Stipulation. This Stipulation shall not modify any other deadlines set in the Court's Case Schedule. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/9/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP re 160 Notice. The law firm of Perkins Coie LLP will continue to represent Intel Corporation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED approving the withdrawal of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP as counsel for Intel Corporation. Attorney Joan Elizabeth Shreffler; Raoul Dion Kennedy and James Patrick Schaefer terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the pending dispositive Motion, the Court finds that a Preliminary Pretrial Conference would be premature at this time. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the January 31 Conference. The Court will set a new Preliminary Pretrial Conference date in its Order addressing Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, if necessary. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/26/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Intel's Motion for Summary Judgment; Deeming Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification withdrawn. Signed by Judge James Ware on December 15, 2010. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER REQUESTING UN-REDACTED CHAMBERS COPIES OF MOTIONS TO SEAL AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS. Accordingly, on or before 11/15/2010 by 3 p.m., Defendants shall lodge with the Court, by way of the Clerk's office, a binder with a copy of un-redacted ve rsions of all motion papers and supporting declarations for Docket Item Nos. 111-120, including un-redacted copies of all documents which the parties dispute should be sealed. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Stipulation Re Administrative Motion for Sealing Order re 109 Stipulation., Motions terminated: 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/5/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Plaintiffs Time to Oppose Defendant Intel's Motion to Seal re 103 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/5/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Adjusting Briefing and Hearing Schedule re 101 Stipulation. Motion for Class Certification due by 10/22/2010, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 93 Document E-Filed Under Seal and Class Certification briefing: Opposition due by 11/19/2010. Replies due by 12/2/2010. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/23/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Class Certification and Summary Judgment Motions re 99 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for Class Certification and Summary Judgment on 11/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE AMENDMENT TO STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ENTERED JANUARY 14, 2010 re 90 Stipulation, filed by Esmeralda Mendez, Barry Wachsler, Business Applications Performance Corp., Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 26, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline For ADR Session re 78 Stipulation. ADR deadline set for 8/2/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/15/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT re 73 Stipulation Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2010 as a separate docket entry.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 69 Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/30/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 58 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/22/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Initial Disclosures re 53 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 51 . Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/14/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time To File A Consolidated Complaint by 1/15/2010 re 50 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/18/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL re 47 Stipulation. The Court approves Girard Gibbs LLP as interim class counsel. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ANDBEGIN DISCOVERY re (39 in 5:09-cv-02889-JW) Stipulation. The Court finds good cause to GRANT the parties' Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLEADINGS re (22 in 5:09-cv-02889-JW) Stipulation. (1) Defendant may have until 10/2/2009 to respond to the original complaintsin Mendez (09-cv-02889-JW) and Daniel's Den (09-cv-0335 6-JW); and(2) If either Plaintiff files an amended complaint or if the Plaintiffs file aconsolidated complaint, Defendant will have thirty-five (35) days to respond to such pleading(s). Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/30/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez -v- Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Mendez
Represented By: Austin P. Tighe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?