MSGI Security Solutions, Inc. v. Hyundai Syscomm Corporation et al

Plaintiff: MSGI Security Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Hyundai Syscomm Corporation, Hyundai Syscomm, Inc., APRO Media Corporation, APRO Media Co, Ltd., Hirsch Group LLLP, Hirsch Capital Corporation, Hyundai RFMON Corporation, Samuel Lee, Jack Choe, Benjamin Byun, Wallace Benjamin Garst, Jr. and David Choe
Case Number: 5:2009cv03330
Filed: July 21, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 162 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/29/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
May 1, 2013 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/30/2013 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/24/2013. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/1/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 12, 2013 156 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
October 18, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 126 TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES. Stipulation filed by MSGI Security Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/18/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
March 7, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 118 TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLETE EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/7/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
January 21, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/25/2011. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/20/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
September 24, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLETE EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/24/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
July 12, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED (with signature) ORDER RE: 83 DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 07/09/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 9, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 71 DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 07/09/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
November 24, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO DISMISS granting 17 ; denying 18 ; granting 19 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/24/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
August 24, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CONSENT/DECLINATION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/24/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 12, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 5 TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/13/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSGI Security Solutions, Inc. v. Hyundai Syscomm Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Syscomm Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Syscomm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APRO Media Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APRO Media Co, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hirsch Group LLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hirsch Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai RFMON Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Choe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Byun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Benjamin Garst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Choe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSGI Security Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R. VanVleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?