September 29, 2010 |
Filing
246
STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE AND SUSPENDING CASE DEADLINES PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/28/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
|
September 27, 2010 |
Filing
244
STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2 FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/27/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
|
September 22, 2010 |
Filing
242
ORDER GRANTING 224 Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendants 724 Solutions (US) Inc. and 724 Solutions Software Inc. Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6). 724 Solutions shall designate and produce deponents for its deposition pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) within one month of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 09/22/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
|
September 21, 2010 |
Filing
239
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 194 Openwave's July 20, 2010 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 09/21/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
|
August 13, 2010 |
Filing
221
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 220 CONTINUING TUTORIAL. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/1/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/13/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing
218
ORDER DENYING 198 , 204 , 215 , 217 ; VACATING 197 , 202 , 212 , 214 ; AND GRANTING 211 . Within the next 14 days, the parties attorneys (including their lead attorneys) on these matters shall meet and confer in person, face-to-face, abo ut their respective motions. If after 14 days all of the issues have not been resolved, Openwave and/or 724 Solutions may thereafter file new motions to compel complete with new briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lloyd on 08/04/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing
201
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 200 Withdrawing Plaintiffs' Motion for Permission to Disclose Protected Material to Chetan Sharma. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 07/30/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing
196
STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/27/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing
187
ORDER DENYING 186 Stipulation Shortening Time to Hear Openwave's Motion for Permission to Disclose Protected Material to Chetan Sharma and VACATING 185 Re-Noticed Hearing Date (Other). The July 13 hearing date re-noticed by Openwave is vacated. Openwave's motion shall be heard on 08/03/2010. Any opposition shall be filed by 07/13/2010 and any reply shall be filed by 07/20/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 06/24/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
|
June 3, 2010 |
Filing
184
ORDER re NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney 181 filed by 724 Solutions (US) Inc, 724 Solutions Software, Inc signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on June 2, 2010. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
|
June 1, 2010 |
Filing
183
STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/3/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
|
April 22, 2010 |
Filing
167
ORDER RE: 89 GRANTING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/22/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
|
April 21, 2010 |
Filing
166
STIPULATION AND ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR OPENWAVE'S MOTION TO DISCLOSE PROTECTED MATERIAL re 164 Stipulation, filed by Openwave Systems, Inc., Openwave Systems (ROI) Ltd. Motion hearing for 162 set for 5/18/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/21/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
|
April 8, 2010 |
Filing
152
ORDER RE: 150 FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING BY 04/13/2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/08/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
|
March 9, 2010 |
Filing
121
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 118 Stipulation filed by Openwave Systems, Inc., Openwave Systems (ROI) Ltd. Motion Hearing for 74 Motion to Compel continued to 4/20/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/9/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing
119
ORDER RE: 39 MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/08/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
|
February 11, 2010 |
Filing
88
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 86 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 03/11/2010 AT 10:00 AM. Parties' Joint Case Management Statement is due no later than 03/04/2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 02/11/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010).
|
February 10, 2010 |
Filing
87
INTERIM ORDER re 74 Motion to Compel filed by Openwave Systems, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/10/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
|
January 29, 2010 |
Filing
70
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 69 CONTINUING HEARING TO 02/17/2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 01/29/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010).
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing
64
ORDER RE: 61 DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 01/25/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010).
|
January 20, 2010 |
Filing
53
ORDER RE: 49 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 01/20/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 01/20/2010).
|
October 30, 2009 |
Filing
29
ORDER to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss re 26 Stipulation filed by 724 Solutions (US) Inc, 724 Solutions Software, Inc., Openwave Systems, Inc., Motions terminated: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by 724 Solutions (US) Inc, 724 Solutions Software, Inc. Defendants have until and including 11/12/2009 to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/29/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing
16
ORDER to extend time to respond to complaint re 15 Stipulation filed by 724 Solutions (US) Inc, 724 Solutions Software, Inc., Openwave Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/28/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
|