All One God Faith, Inc. v. The Hain Celestial Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: All One God Faith, Inc.
Defendant: The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., Kiss My Face Corporation, Levlad, LLC, YSL Beautem Inc., Giovanni Cosmetics, Inc., Cosway Company, Inc., Country Life, LLC, Organic and Sustainable Industry Standards, Inc., Ecocert France (SAS) and Ecocert, Inc.
Counter-claimant: Ecocert, Inc.
Counter-defendant: All One God Faith, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv03517
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 234 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant Giovanni Cosmetics. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/11/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER dismissing Kiss my Face Corp. signed by Judge Illston on 3/1/12 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER dismissing certain claims (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER APPROVING 157 STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE SEPTEMBER 9, 2011 HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/1/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND PROCEED WITH DISCOVERY re 147 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/28/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/15/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER APPROVING 120 STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2010 is RESET for 10/15/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/20/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL 83 84 86 87 89 94 114 GRANTING YSL'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND STAYING ACTION AS TO ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW LEVLAD, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re 99 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/13/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER APPROVING 82 STIPULATION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER APPROVING 79 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/27/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 15 17 25 27 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 39 MOTION TO DISMISS ECOCERT'S COUNTER-CLAIM. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER APPROVING 74 STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PENDING RULING ON MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/22/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF PLAINTIFF ALL ONE GOD FAITH, INC. AND DEFENDANT COSWAY, INC. TO AMEND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 54 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/11/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AUTHORIZING SETTING OF HEARING ON ALL ONE GOD FAITH, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS ECOCERT FRANCE'S (SAS) AND ECOCERT, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIM (approving 37 ). Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/27/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All One God Faith, Inc. v. The Hain Celestial Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All One God Faith, Inc.
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mali Beck Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiss My Face Corporation
Represented By: Mali Beck Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levlad, LLC
Represented By: Mali Beck Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YSL Beautem Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Mattesich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanni Cosmetics, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Terry Holzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosway Company, Inc.
Represented By: R. Duane Westrup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Life, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Kneeland Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic and Sustainable Industry Standards, Inc.
Represented By: James Russell Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecocert France (SAS)
Represented By: Thomas H. Clarke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecocert, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas H. Clarke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Ecocert, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas H. Clarke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: All One God Faith, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?