State Farm General Insurance Company v. Franke Consumer Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: State Farm General Insurance Company
Defendant: Franke Consumer Products, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv03555
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 Dismissal. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/29/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 24 27 Striking Untimely Demand for Trial by Jury. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/14/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/24/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Demand for Trial by Jury Should Not Be Stricken and the Case Set for Bench Trial. Show Cause Response due by 4/13/2010. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/23/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 11 selecting Mediation. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm General Insurance Company v. Franke Consumer Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas Kent Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franke Consumer Products, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Dean Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?