AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. v. Funai Electric Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Amtran Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Funai Electric Co., Ltd., Funai Corporation, Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc. and Sony Corporation of America
Case Number: 5:2009cv03645
Filed: August 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/10/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 239 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 238 Continuing Motion Hearing (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Motion hearing re 221 and 228 continued to 6/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/27/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 236 continuing motion hearing. Motion hearings re 221 and 228 continued to 5/11/2010, 10:00 AM. Associated briefing deadlines adjusted accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/13/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE AND HEARING (approving 189 ). Tutorial and Claim Construction hearing set for 1/19/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/29/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER (1) GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES; (2) DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME; AND (3) SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/26/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying 52 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/27/2009. (llj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. v. Funai Electric Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amtran Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jim S. Zeng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funai Electric Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Grant Chieh-Hsiang Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funai Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Grant Chieh-Hsiang Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Represented By: Patricia L Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia L Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Represented By: Patricia L Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?