Howard v. Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York et al
Plaintiff: Yvonne Howard
Defendant: Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York, Cigna Health Corporation and Loral Space and Communications, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 5:2009cv04092
Filed: September 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 29 GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall close the file and terminate any pending motions. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/30/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 26 and 27 SETTING DEADLINE OF OCTOBER 15, 2010 FOR PARTIES TO FILE THEIR PROPOSED STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/29/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR COMPLETING MEDIATION re 23 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/9/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 21 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/4/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 16 , Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/4/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Howard
Represented By: Lissa Anne Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loral Space and Communications, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?