Tufono v. Valenzuela et al
Plaintiff: Arvello L. Tufono
Defendant: M. Valenzuela, V. Franco and D. Galindo
Case Number: 5:2009cv04136
Filed: September 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER following status conference entered by Magistrate Judge Vadas. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying 26 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Referring Case to Pro Se Prisoner Settlement Program by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 31 , 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; Denying 32 , 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of Service; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/6/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tufono v. Valenzuela et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arvello L. Tufono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Galindo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?