Ariba, Inc. v. National Grid Corporation of the Philippines
Plaintiff: Ariba, Inc.
Defendant: National Grid Corporation of the Philippines
Case Number: 5:2009cv04495
Filed: September 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE: 24 GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING ON ENTITLEMENT TO REQUESTED RELIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/21/10. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/2/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS AMENDED BY THE COURT re 17 Stipulated Protective Order filed by Ariba, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/5/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 01/27/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 05/27/2010 in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, United States Courthouse in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due no later than 05/20/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010).
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 4 TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/12/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariba, Inc. v. National Grid Corporation of the Philippines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariba, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Charles Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Grid Corporation of the Philippines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?