Textscape, LLC v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Textscape, LLC
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv04552
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2009 Filing 10
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Textscape, LLC (Dergosits, Michael) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 6 plaintiff's motion to enlarge time. Deadline to meet/confer re initial disclosures, early settlement, ADR process selection, and discovery plan: 1/12/2010. Deaadline to file either a Stipulation to ADR Process or Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference: 1/12/2010. Deadline to file Rule 26(f) Report, complete initial disclosures or state objection in Rule 26(f) Report and file Case Management Statement: 1/26/2010. Initial case management conference re-set for 2/2/2010, 1:30 PM. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 15, 2009 Filing 7
**DOCKETED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD***SEE DOCKET ( 8 )** (Proposed) Order Enlarging Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-3 and 16-2(d) by Textscape, LLC. (Dergosits, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2009) Modified on 12/15/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/16/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/16/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5
RELATED CASE ORDER - Case are NOT RELATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/29/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 4
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
October 22, 2021 Filing 98
October 22, 2021 Filing 97
October 22, 2021 Filing 95
October 22, 2021 Filing 93
October 22, 2021 Filing 92
October 22, 2021 Filing 91
October 22, 2021 Filing 90
October 22, 2021 Filing 89
October 22, 2021 Filing 88
October 22, 2021 Filing 87
October 22, 2021 Filing 86
October 22, 2021 Filing 84
October 22, 2021 Filing 82
October 22, 2021 Filing 81
October 22, 2021 Filing 80
October 22, 2021 Filing 79
October 22, 2021 Filing 77
October 22, 2021 Filing 76
October 22, 2021 Filing 75
October 22, 2021 Filing 74
October 22, 2021 Filing 72
October 22, 2021 Filing 71
October 22, 2021 Filing 69
October 22, 2021 Filing 67
October 22, 2021 Filing 66
October 22, 2021 Filing 65
October 22, 2021 Filing 64
October 22, 2021 Filing 63
October 22, 2021 Filing 62
October 22, 2021 Filing 61
October 22, 2021 Filing 59
October 22, 2021 Filing 58
October 22, 2021 Filing 57
October 22, 2021 Filing 56
October 22, 2021 Filing 55
October 22, 2021 Filing 54
October 22, 2021 Filing 53
October 22, 2021 Filing 52
October 22, 2021 Filing 50
October 22, 2021 Filing 49
October 22, 2021 Filing 48
October 22, 2021 Filing 47
October 22, 2021 Filing 46
October 22, 2021 Filing 45
October 22, 2021 Filing 42
October 22, 2021 Filing 41
October 22, 2021 Filing 40
October 22, 2021 Filing 39
October 22, 2021 Filing 38
October 22, 2021 Filing 37
October 22, 2021 Filing 36
October 22, 2021 Filing 35
October 22, 2021 Filing 34
October 22, 2021 Filing 33
October 22, 2021 Filing 32
October 22, 2021 Filing 31
October 22, 2021 Filing 30
October 22, 2021 Filing 29
October 22, 2021 Filing 28
October 22, 2021 Filing 27
October 22, 2021 Filing 26
October 22, 2021 Filing 25
October 22, 2021 Filing 24
October 22, 2021 Filing 23
October 22, 2021 Filing 22
October 22, 2021 Filing 21
October 22, 2021 Filing 20
October 22, 2021 Filing 19
October 22, 2021 Filing 18
October 22, 2021 Filing 17
October 22, 2021 Filing 16
October 22, 2021 Filing 15
October 22, 2021 Filing 14
October 22, 2021 Filing 13
October 22, 2021 Filing 12
October 22, 2021 Filing 11
October 22, 2021 Filing 112
October 22, 2021 Filing 111
October 22, 2021 Filing 110
October 22, 2021 Filing 109
October 22, 2021 Filing 108
October 22, 2021 Filing 107
October 22, 2021 Filing 106
October 22, 2021 Filing 104
October 22, 2021 Filing 103
October 22, 2021 Filing 100
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Textscape, LLC v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Textscape, LLC
Represented By: Corby R. Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?