Textscape, LLC v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Textscape, LLC
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv04552
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: The Case Management Conferencen set on 7/9/2010 is vacated. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING THE LITIGATION PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,713,740 re 55 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/2/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 1, 2010 Filing 55 STIPULATION to Stay Pending Reexamination by Textscape, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 54 NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 52 First MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination , Amended Notice of Hearing Now Set for August 6, 2010 at 9:00 am (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 51 First MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity , Amended Notice of Hearing Now Set for August 6, 2010 at 9:00 am (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 16, 2010 Filing 52 First MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 16, 2010 Filing 51 First MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PARTIES TO PRIVATELY MEDIATE re 49 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/26/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 49 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Parties to Privately Mediate by Google, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Corby R. Vowell (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 47 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/12/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 3/12/2010). The Court adopts the proposed case schedule. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/12/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 46 Proposed Order re 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006970.) by Textscape, LLC. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 45 MOTION for Attorney Corby R. Vowell for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006970.) filed by Textscape, LLC. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 39 , Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/22/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 43 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT : Amended Joint Case Management Statement filed by Textscape, LLC. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MARCH 12, 2010 (approving 41 ). The Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2010 is CONTINUED to 3/12/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 41 STIPULATION re 38 Clerks Notice AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MARCH 12, 2010 by Google, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 17, 2010 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 2/18/10 has been taken off calendar. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 39 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Textscape, LLC (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 38 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2010 is continued to 2/26/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 16, 2010 Filing 37 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 2/18/10 at 9:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Textscape, LLC. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 34 Textscape, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Google, Inc. byTextscape, LLC. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by Textscape, LLC (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mark H. Francis (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher C. Carnaval (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Scott T. Weingaertner. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 28 Proposed Order re 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006692.) by Google, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney Mark H. Francis for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006692.) filed by Google, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 26 Proposed Order re 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006692.) by Google, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney Christopher C. Carnaval for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006692.) filed by Google, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 24 Proposed Order re 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006692.) by Google, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney Scott T. Weingaertner for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006692.) filed by Google, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M. Ezgar of Appearance of Robert F. Perry as Counsel (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement of Google Inc., Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, Inc. Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 19 Google Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, First COUNTERCLAIM against Textscape, LLC byGoogle, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 12, 2010 Filing 18 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Commitee on 1/6/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 6, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 5, 2010 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Google Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2010. Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/5/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney)(tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 01/05/10. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 4, 2010 Filing 11 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Google, Inc. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/4/2010) Modified on 1/5/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2009 Filing 10 Proof of Service by Textscape, LLC (Dergosits, Michael) (Filed on 12/29/2009) Modified on 1/5/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 6 plaintiff's motion to enlarge time. Deadline to meet/confer re initial disclosures, early settlement, ADR process selection, and discovery plan: 1/12/2010. Deaadline to file either a Stipulation to ADR Process or Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference: 1/12/2010. Deadline to file Rule 26(f) Report, complete initial disclosures or state objection in Rule 26(f) Report and file Case Management Statement: 1/26/2010. Initial case management conference re-set for 2/2/2010, 1:30 PM. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 8 (Proposed) Order Enlarging Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-3 and 16-2 by Textscape, LLC. (Dergosits, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2009) Modified on 12/16/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2009 Filing 7 **DOCKETED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD***SEE DOCKET ( 8 )** (Proposed) Order Enlarging Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-3 and 16-2(d) by Textscape, LLC. (Dergosits, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2009) Modified on 12/15/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/16/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/16/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2009 Filing 6 MOTION for Enlargement of Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-3 and 16-2(d); and Declarationof Michael E. Dergosits in Support filed by Textscape, LLC. (Dergosits, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2009) Modified on 12/15/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER - Case are NOT RELATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/29/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 25, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2010. Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2010 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes Judge Lloyd, # 2 Standing Order for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Order for all Northern District Judges) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc. bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611037094). Filed by Textscape, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Textscape, LLC v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Textscape, LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Dergosits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C. Carnaval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?