The Otter Project; Environmental Defense Center v. Salazar et al
Plaintiff: The Otter Project; Environmental Defense Center
Defendant: Ken Salazar, Sam Hamilton, United States Department of Interior and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 5:2009cv04610
Filed: September 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 69 Stipulation (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice re 66 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/23/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Staying Proceedings Through November 24, 2010 re 64 Stipulation. Proposal due 11/22/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/26/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Stay of Proceedings for Ten Days re 62 Stipulation. All proceedings in this case are stayed for 10 days. The parties shall file a proposal for further proceedings, if any, on 10/25/2010. The present summary-judgment briefing and hearing schedule shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/29/10. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule and Continuing Hearing Date Pending Settlement Discussions re 56 Stipulation. ***Deadlines terminated re 49 SCHEDULING ORDER; Set/Reset Deadlines as to 56 Stipulation: Administrative Record due 10/18/2010, Plaintiffs/Intervenor Motion deadline 11/12/2010 re challenge of Administrative Record; Motion deadline re Motion for Summary Judgment due 11/15/2010, Oppositions due 12/6/2010, Replies due 12/20/2010. Motion Hearing re Summary Judgment set for 1/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND REFERRING CASE TO JUDGE LAPORTE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 52 Stipulation. The Court finds good cause to refer this case to Magistrate Judge Laporte for a Settlement Conference. On or before 7/2/2010, the parties shall contact Judge Laporte's Chambers to schedule their settlement conference. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to File Answer from 5/24/2010 to 6/3/2010 re 45 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference re 43 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2010. Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to 12/21/2009 re 17 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Otter Project; Environmental Defense Center v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Otter Project; Environmental Defense Center
Represented By: Brian Paul Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?