Varsity Contractors, Inc., v. General Employees Trust Fund
Plaintiff: Varsity Contractors, Inc.,
Defendant: General Employees Trust Fund
Case Number: 5:2009cv04633
Filed: September 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/30/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/17/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 28 GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/10/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 20 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/1/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS re 10 Stipulation. This matter is stayed until 4/23/2010. Joint Case Management Conference Statement due due by 4/30/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varsity Contractors, Inc., v. General Employees Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varsity Contractors, Inc.,
Represented By: Anthony Joseph DeCristoforo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Employees Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?