Mohare v. Eastman Kodak Company
Plaintiff: Pradnesh Mohare
Defendant: Eastman Kodak Company
Case Number: 5:2009cv04705
Filed: October 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE re 30 Stipulation. ***Deadlines terminated. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 17 Parties' Proposed Form of Protective Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/1/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal With Prejudice of First, Second and Third Causes of Action of Second Amended Complaint re 26 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER - (JURY TRIAL). The 9/13/2010 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: Joint Pretrial Conference Statement, In Limine Motions, and P roposed Jury Instructions Due 1/28/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 3/15/2011 09:00AM, Jury Trial set for 3/15/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further trial specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Leave To File Second Amended Complaint And Response re 20 Stipulation. Second Amended Complaint due as a separate docket entry by 6/7/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation re 14 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Leave To File First Amended Complaint and Answer re 7 Stipulation.For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties' Stipulation. On or before November 6, 2009, Plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry. On or before November 13, 2009, Defendant shall file their Answer to the First Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohare v. Eastman Kodak Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pradnesh Mohare
Represented By: Michael James Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Kodak Company
Represented By: Seth Lewis Neulight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?