Holmes v. Denny's, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Florine Holmes
Defendant: Denny's, Inc., Prompt Food Services, Inc. and Frank Hernandez
Mediator: Howard A. Herman
Case Number: 5:2009cv04785
Filed: January 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal of Defendants Denny's, Inc., Prompt Food Service, Inc. and Frank Hernandez pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) re 31 Stipulation. ***OSC Deadlines terminated. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/30/2010 09:00 AM. Joint Status Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 8/16/2010. If a voluntary dismissal is filed as ordered, the Order to Show Cause hearing will be automatically vacated. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss this action. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/8/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE. Based on the parties' representation, the Court finds it appropriate to provide a brief extension of time to finalize the settlement agreement. The parties shall file either a stipulated dismissal of the action or a Joint Case Management Conference Statement providing the Court with an update on the status of their settlement agreement. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***CMC Deadlines terminated re 25 ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/24/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the action be reassigned to the San Jose Division of the U.S. District Court re 18 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/21/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified on 1/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the claims against Defendant C B Development #5 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/13/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010) Modified on 1/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER: to allow Defendants to file Amended Answer by 12/02/09. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/30/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009) Modified on 12/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/13/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Denny's, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florine Holmes
Represented By: Brian Gearinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denny's, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Kenneth Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prompt Food Services, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Kenneth Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Hernandez
Represented By: Todd Kenneth Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Howard A. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?