Trustees of the U.A. Local 393 Pension Fund and the U.A. Local 393 Health and Welfare Trust Fund v. Pacific Air Solutions Corporation
Plaintiff: Trustees of the U.A. Local 393 Pension Fund and the U.A. Local 393 Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Defendant: Pacific Air Solutions Corporation
Case Number: 5:2009cv04821
Filed: October 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER VACATING DECEMBER 14, 2010 HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT 26 . Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment is deemed suitable for determination without oral argument, and the December 14, 2010 hearing is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/7/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 18 Request for Telephonic Court Appearance filed by Pacific Air Solutions Corporation, Pacific Air Solutions Service Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/12/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 9 Stipulation, filed by Trustees of the U.A. Local 393 Pension Fund and the U.A. Local 393 Health and Welfare Trust Fund. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 4/13/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/27/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the U.A. Local 393 Pension Fund and the U.A. Local 393 Health and Welfare Trust Fund v. Pacific Air Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the U.A. Local 393 Pension Fund and the U.A. Local 393 Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Mark Stephan Renner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Air Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?