Kakogui v. American Brokers Conduit et al

Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Kakogui
Defendant: American Brokers Conduit, EMC Mortgage, Inc., American's Servicing Company, US Bank National Association, First American Title Company, Pacific Residential Appraisal Services, Casa Del Mar Financial Services, Eduardo Duron, Carol Foster and Pacific Sun Properties
Case Number: 5:2009cv04841
Filed: October 13, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 47 and 57 GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE AS TO FEDERAL CLAIMS, REMANDING TO SUPERIOR COURT FOR CONSIDERATION OF STATE LAW CLAIMS. The Clerk shall close the file and terminate any pending motions. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/14/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
June 24, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as Premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 06/24/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
March 30, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jeremy Fogel. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
February 25, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING 30 , 32 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LLOYD'S ORDER OF FEBRUARY 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/25/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 3, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 28 Ex Parte Application by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 19, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLARIFYING 21 ORDER ISSUED JANUARY 11, 2010; AND TERMINATING AS MOOT 6 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/19/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 11, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 16 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND GRANTING 20 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/11/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kakogui v. American Brokers Conduit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Kakogui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Brokers Conduit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American's Servicing Company
Represented By: Donald John Querio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Residential Appraisal Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casa Del Mar Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Duron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Sun Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?