Knotts v. Carreira et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Knotts
Defendant: Ray Carreira, Steven Ernst, Santa Clara Police Officers, the identities and exact number of whom unknown to Plaintiff at this time and City of Santa Clara
Case Number: 5:2009cv04851
Filed: October 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 28 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on July 7, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DATES re 47 . Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 6/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. The case management conference is vacated. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/9/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATING 28 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED JULY 30, 2010; AND DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE A NEW NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR MAY 20, 2011. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/4/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DATES re 43 . Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2011 09:00 AM, to be heard with the motion, in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 7/15/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose b efore Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Jury Trial set for 7/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/12/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 41 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. The Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2010 are CONTINUED to 1/28/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/8/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/8/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 38 . Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/7/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER APPROVING 35 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 is CONTINUED to 10/15/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/13/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLETE ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION AND TERMINATING ENE REFERRAL re 25 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/23/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLETE ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION re 22 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/14/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE, TIME TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY, AND OTHER ASSOCIATED DATES (approving 19 ). Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial set for 2/28/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/28/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 13 , Case referred to early neutral evaluation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/26/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knotts v. Carreira et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Knotts
Represented By: Anthony Boskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Carreira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Police Officers, the identities and exact number of whom unknown to Plaintiff at this time
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?