Spring Design, Inc. v. Barnesandnoble.com, LLC
Plaintiff: Spring Design, Inc.
Defendant: Barnesandnoble.com, LLC
Case Number: 5:2009cv05185
Filed: November 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) re 192 Stipulation. ***Deadlines terminated, Motions terminated: 189 MOTION Exclude the Opinion and Testimony of Daniel Burns on Damages filed by Barnesandnoble.com, LLC. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/9/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 151 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, filed by Spring Design, Inc., 145 Document E-Filed Under Seal, filed by Barnesandnoble.com, LLC. Signed by Judge James Ware on December 27, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. In light of the pending dispositive Motions and referral to the Special Master, the Court finds that a Preliminary Pretrial Conference would be premature at this time. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the December 13 Conference. The Court will set a new Preliminary Pretrial Conference date in its Order addressing the parties' pending Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, if necessary. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/8/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON MOTIONS; REFERRING PARTIES TO SPECIAL MASTER. On or before November 24, 2010, the parties shall meet and confer with the Special Master to set a time table for the submission of their proposed chronology of undisputed fact s. For each event in the chronology, the chronology shall contain a brief summary of what occurred, what was disclosed to whom, and citations to supporting evidence. On or before December 10, 2010, the Special Master shall submit a report to the Court containing a final chronology. The Court will set a further hearing date after receipt of the Special Masters report, if necessary. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/22/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING 129 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/2/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Granting Request to Exceed Page Limit on Defendant Barnesandnoble.com LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff Spring Design, Inc.s Opposition to Summary Judgment re 118 Stipulation. Page limit for each is 30 pages. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE re 111 Stipulation. Motion Hearing re Summary Judgment set for 11/22/2010 09:00 AM. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 12/3/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS DISCOVERY ORDER re 104 Objection filed by Barnesandnoble.com, LLC. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 3, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re 82 Stipulation. Deadline to file Second Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry on or before 1/15/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/11/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge James Ware on December 21, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPOINT A SPECIAL MASTER. The parties shall file any objections to Mr. Denver being named as Special Master on or before 12/17/2009. In their objections, the parties shall provide alternate nominations. If no objection is filed a nd Mr. Denver accepts his appointment, Mr. Denver shall file an affidavit as required by FED. R. CIV. P. 53(b)(3). The Court's appointment of the Special Master shall become effective on 12/18/2009. Once the appointment is effective, the parties shall notice all relevant discovery and pretrial motions before the Special Master. Signed by Judge James Ware on December 9, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009) Modified text on 12/10/2009 (ecgS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Extend Time for Defendant's Responsive Pleading re 74 Stipulation. Answer due 12/14/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/4/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 34 Stipulation for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; Terminating 33 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/20/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spring Design, Inc. v. Barnesandnoble.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spring Design, Inc.
Represented By: Saina Sason Shamilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnesandnoble.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?