Kent v. Hewlett-Packard Company

Plaintiff: Michael A Kent
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Case Number: 5:2009cv05341
Filed: November 12, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLOSING CASE FILE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 4, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 28, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE FILE SHOULD NOT BE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 28, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
April 20, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING A NATIONWIDE SETTLEMENT CLASS, APPROVING PROPOSED NOTICE, AND SCHEDULING FAIRNESS HEARING (granting 87 ). Final Approval Hearing set for 7/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/15/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
March 10, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND VACATING CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 85 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/10/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
January 20, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 66 . Plaintiffs' motion to compel 62 shall be heard by Magistrate Judge Lloyd on March 1, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Briefing on the motion shall proceed in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/20/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 5, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS (approving 67 ). The Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2011 is CONTINUED to 3/4/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/5/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
December 20, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 20, 2010. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
November 10, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LLOYD FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 56 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/10/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 4, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (approving 54 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/4/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FILE DECLARATION RE SEALED MATERIAL re 49 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/30/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 14, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (approving 45 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/14/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 13, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (approving 42 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/13/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
July 6, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 25 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/6/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 11, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re 38 Stipulation filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on June 11, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
March 26, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 28 , Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/22/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
February 8, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 11 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/2/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
January 14, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (approving 9 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kent v. Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Kent
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?