Waste Connections of California, Inc. v. DOXA Construction and Development, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Waste Connections of California, Inc. |
Defendant: |
DOXA Construction and Development, Inc., Western States Erectors, Inc., Roger Oliver and Joseph Benenati |
Cross-claimant: |
Roger Oliver and DOXA Construction and Development, Inc. |
Cross-defendant: |
Joseph Benenati, Waste Connections of California, Inc. and Western States Erectors, Inc. |
Case Number: |
5:2009cv05345 |
Filed: |
November 12, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard Seeborg |
Presiding Judge: |
James Ware |
Nature of Suit: |
Defendant |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 2, 2011 |
Filing
80
ORDER Granting 78 Notice for Request for Dismissal of Claims and Defendants filed by Waste Connections of California, Inc. The Court to issue final judgment. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/2/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
|
January 20, 2011 |
Filing
72
ORDER Granting Motion for Clarification. The Court clarifies as follows:.(1) The Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED as to J. Hector Moreno, Jr. (CA Bar 131970), Andrew L. Westover, LL.M. (CA Bar 253398), Rory Coetzee (CA Bar 259209), and The Law Firm of J . Hector Moreno, Jr. & Associates; (2) On or before January 24, 20111, counsel shall provide the Court with an address for Defendants such that all future pleadings, motions, discovery, and any and all other communications concerning this matt er may be forwarded directly to Defendants. (3) Upon providing Defendants current address, counsel shall be relieved of any and all further obligations on behalf of Defendant Roger Oliver and DOXA Construction and Development, Inc. (4) Counsel shall send a copy of this Order to Defendants and file the necessary certificate of service. The Court finds good cause to VACATE the Conference at this time. The Court will set a new conference date in its Order addressing the pending Motions. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 20, 2011. (jwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011) Modified text on 1/20/2011 (x2)(ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 1/20/2011,typographical error.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
|
June 14, 2010 |
Filing
49
ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS DOXA AND OLIVER'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT re 42 MOTION for Default Judgment as to JOSEPH BENENATI, an Individual, and WESTERN STATES ERECTORS, INC.. ***Motions terminated: 42 MOTION for Default Judgment as to JOSEPH BENENATI, an Individual, and WESTERN STATES ERECTORS, INC. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Waste Connections of California, Inc. v. DOXA Construction and Development, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Waste Connections of California, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Treven Isaac Tilbury |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: DOXA Construction and Development, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Andrew Lee Westover, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Western States Erectors, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Roger Oliver |
Represented By: |
Andrew Lee Westover, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Joseph Benenati |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross-claimant: Roger Oliver |
Represented By: |
Andrew Lee Westover, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross-claimant: DOXA Construction and Development, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Andrew Lee Westover, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross-defendant: Joseph Benenati |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross-defendant: Waste Connections of California, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Treven Isaac Tilbury |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross-defendant: Western States Erectors, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?