Everlove v. Texas Turkey, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Victor Everlove
Defendant: Texas Turkey, Inc., John M. Filice and Craig P Filice
Case Number: 5:2009cv05361
Filed: November 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 57 Adopting Joint Stipulation to Extend Site Inspection Deadline. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/13/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CONSENT DECREE AND ORDER. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal by Friday, April 22, 2011. Signed by Judge Koh on 4/15/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Seeking Clarification re 46 Proposed Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/29/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Requiring Parties to file Joint Status Report by 1:00 p.m., Monday, March 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/17/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 38 Granting Motion for Administrative Relief from General Order 56. Signed by Judge Koh on 12/6/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2010 is vacated. The Case Management Conference is now set for 10/20/2010 at 2:00PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. The Mediation hearing scheduled for 9/16/2010 is vacated, and now set for 9/22/2010 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/15/2010.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everlove v. Texas Turkey, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Everlove
Represented By: Paul Leslie Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Turkey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Filice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig P Filice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?