Wakefield v. Apple, Inc et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Franz A Wakefield
Defendant: Apple, Inc, Steve Jobs and Sarah Jessica Parker
Case Number: 5:2009cv05420
Filed: November 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2010 Filing 84 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 6, 2010 Filing 83 MANDATE of USCA The judgment of this Court, entered 9/14/10 81 USCA ORDER, takes effect this date. This Constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the FRAP. as to 77 Notice of Appeal, filed by Franz A Wakefield (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 82 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER of USCA filed (RICHARD R. CLIFTON, JAY S. BYBEE and SANDRA S. IKUTA) A review of the record and the response to the August 5, 2010 order to show cause indicates that the questions raised in this appeal are so insubstantial as not to require further argument. See Denton v. Hernandez, 504 U.S. 25, 32 (1992) (affirming dismissal as frivolous of clearly baseless factual contentions); see also United States v. Hooton, 693 F.2d 857, 858 (9th Cir. 1982) (per curiam) (stating standard for summary disposition). Accordingly, we summarily affirm the district courts judgment. AFFIRMED. as to 77 Notice of Appeal, filed by Franz A Wakefield (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER of USCA Filed : Order to show cause for summary affirmance. as to 77 Notice of Appeal, filed by Franz A Wakefield (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
July 16, 2010 Filing 79 USCA Case Number 10-16550 9th Circuit Court of Appeals DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PROSE APPELLANT. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 08/16/2010. Transcript due 09/13/2010. Appellant Franz A. Wakefield opening brief due 10/25/2010. Appellee Apple, Inc., Appellee Steve Jobs and Appellee Sarah Jessica Parker answering brief due 11/24/2010. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brieffor 77 Notice of Appeal, filed by Franz A Wakefield. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 78 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals (Case File Available Electronically) re 77 Notice of Appeal, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 75 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone 76 Judgment by Franz A Wakefield. Appeal Record due by 8/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copy of Docket Sheet)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 13, 2010 Remark - clerk mailed copy of docket sheet to Plaintiff, request made by phone. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
June 15, 2010 Filing 76 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/15/10. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE; REQUIRING PRE-FILING REVIEW FOR ALL FUTURE PRO SE COMPLAINTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF Without Prior Judicial Authorization. Plaintiff Franz A. Wakefield is declared a vexatious litigant. The Court orders that the Clerk of this Court SHALL not accept for filing any pro se action by plaintiff Franz A. Wakefield in the United States District Court for the Northern District of California until such complaint HAS BEEN subjected to pre-filing review by a Judge of this Court. This Order SHALL remain in effect for ten (10) years. by Judge James Ware granting 45 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 73 Motion to Appear by Telephone; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010) Modified on 6/16/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2010 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Jessica Parker re 73 MOTION to Appear by Telephone (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 15, 2010 Filing 73 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Sarah Jessica Parker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franz A Wakefield re 71 Notice (Other) (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE of Correction to the Record Transcript From the May 10, 2010 AM Hearing; Which was filed as Exhibit A of the Defendant's Sarah Jessica Parker's Reply Declaration by Franz A Wakefield (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Jessica Parker re 69 Declaration in Support, 68 Reply Memorandum (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 69 Declaration of Ronald D. Arena in Support of 68 Reply Memorandum Re Motion to Dismiss and For An Order Enjoining Further Pro Se Complaints Without Prior Judicial Authorization filed bySarah Jessica Parker. (Related document(s) 68 ) (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 68 Reply Memorandum re 45 MOTION to Dismiss and for an Order Enjoining Further Pro Se Complaints without Prior Judicial Authorization filed bySarah Jessica Parker. (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 1, 2010 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franz A Wakefield re 65 Declaration in Support, 64 Memorandum in Opposition, 66 Proposed Order (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
June 1, 2010 Filing 66 Proposed Order re 45 MOTION to Dismiss and for an Order Enjoining Further Pro Se Complaints without Prior Judicial Authorization by Franz A Wakefield. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
June 1, 2010 Filing 65 Declaration in Support of 64 Memorandum in Opposition filed byFranz A Wakefield. (Related document(s) 64 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
June 1, 2010 Filing 64 Memorandum in Opposition re 45 MOTION to Dismiss and for an Order Enjoining Further Pro Se Complaints without Prior Judicial Authorization filed byFranz A Wakefield. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 63 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/10/2010, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 10, 2010 Filing 62 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 5/10/2010) re 22 MOTION to Dismiss. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER as Modified by the Court Granting 56 Motion to Appear by Telephone as to Defendant Sarah Jessica Parker. Counsel is permitted to appear on a listen only basis for the 5/10/2010 hearing. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING RELATION OF CASES C09-5420 JW and C09-5779 HRL ; DISMISSING Case C09-5779 HRL AS DUPLICATIVE. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 3, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010). (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc, Steve Jobs re 58 Reply Memorandum, (Maxwell, Emily) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 58 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants Apple Inc. and Steve Jobs' 22 Motion to Dismiss and MOTION for An Order Enjoining Further Pro Se Complaints Without Prior Judicial Authorization filed by Apple, Inc, Steve Jobs. (Maxwell, Emily) (Filed on 4/26/2010) Modified on 4/28/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2010 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Jessica Parker re 56 MOTION to Appear by Telephone (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 56 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Sarah Jessica Parker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franz A Wakefield re 53 Declaration in Support, 52 Memorandum in Opposition, 54 Proposed Order (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 54 Proposed Order re 45 MOTION to Dismiss and for an Order Enjoining Further Pro Se Complaints without Prior Judicial Authorization by Franz A Wakefield. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 53 Declaration in Support of 52 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byFranz A Wakefield. (Related document(s) 52 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 52 Memorandum in Opposition re 45 MOTION to Dismiss and for an Order Enjoining Further Pro Se Complaints without Prior Judicial Authorization, 22 MOTION to Dismiss filed byFranz A Wakefield. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Denying 48 Motion to Consolidate Motion Hearing. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Jessica Parker re 48 MOTION Unopposed Administrative Application to Have Motion to Dismiss Hearings Consolidated, 49 Declaration in Support (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 49 Declaration of Ronald D. Arena in Support of 48 MOTION Unopposed Administrative Application to Have Motion to Dismiss Hearings Consolidated filed bySarah Jessica Parker. (Related document(s) 48 ) (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 48 MOTION for an order to have Hearings on the MOTIONS 22 AND 45 to Dismiss Consolidated. Hearing set for 6/21/10 at 9:00am courtroom 8, 4th floor at 9:00am filed by Sarah Jessica Parker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 4/12/2010) Modified text on 4/12/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2010 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed 1/13/10 forwarded to NY for service. 1/22/10 - 1st attempt there was no one in Mr. Shreck Office to accept summons. 2nd attempt on Sarah Jessica Parker served on 1/25/2010, out of office till 2/1/10 answer due 2/16/2010. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Jessica Parker re 45 MOTION to Dismiss and for an Order Enjoining Further Pro Se Complaints without Prior Judicial Authorization (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION for an Order Enjoining Further Pro Se Complaints without Prior Judicial Authorization filed by Sarah Jessica Parker. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 3/22/2010) Modified on 3/22/2010,(counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2010 Filing 44 Joinder in Defendants Apple Inc. and Steve Jobs 22 Motion to Dismiss and MOTION for an Order Enjoining Further Pro Se Complaints Without Prior Judicial Authorization by Sarah Jessica Parker. (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 3/22/2010) Modified on 3/22/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion and select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER STAYING ALL DISCOVERY AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS APPLE & JOB by Judge James Ware finding as moot 36 Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot 38 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 24 Motion to Appear by Telephone; denying 32 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 32 Motion for Default Judgment (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Jessica Parker re 41 Joinder, (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 41 Joinder In the 38 Motion of Defendants Apple Inc. and Steve Jobs (1) for a Stay of Discovery; and (2) to Continue the Case Management Conference Pending Ruling on Dispositive 36 Motion and Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time Re Motion by Sarah Jessica Parker. (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 3/5/2010) Modified on 3/8/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2010 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc, Steve Jobs re 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options, 36 Ex Parte Application for An Order Shortening Time For Hearing On Motion (1) For A Stay of Discovery; and (2) to Continue the Case Management Conference Pending Ruling On Dispositive Motion 30 Certificate of Interested Entities, 38 MOTION to Stay Discovery; and to Continue the Case Management Conference Pending Ruling On Dispositive Motion (Maxwell, Emily) (Filed on 3/5/2010) Modified on 3/8/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 39 Declaration of Emily L. Maxwell in Support of 38 MOTION to Stay Discovery; and to Continue the Case Management Conference Pending Ruling On Dispositive Motion filed byApple, Inc, Steve Jobs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 38 ) (Maxwell, Emily) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 38 MOTION to Stay Discovery; and to Continue the Case Management Conference Pending Ruling On Dispositive Motion filed by Apple, Inc, Steve Jobs. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maxwell, Emily) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 37 Declaration of Emily L. Maxwell in Support of 36 Ex Parte Application for An Order Shortening Time For Hearing On 38 Motion (1) For A Stay of Discovery; and (2) to Continue the Case Management Conference Pending Ruling On Dispositive Motion filed by Apple, Inc, Steve Jobs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Maxwell, Emily) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/8/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 36 Ex Parte Application for An Order Shortening Time For Hearing On 38 Motion (1) For A Stay of Discovery; and (2) to Continue the Case Management Conference Pending Ruling On Dispositive Motion filed by Apple, Inc, Steve Jobs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maxwell, Emily) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/5/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franz A Wakefield re 32 MOTION for Entry of Default MOTION for Default Judgment as to, 33 Declaration in Support, 34 Proposed Order (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 34 Proposed Order re 32 MOTION for Entry of Default MOTION for Default Judgment as to Apple Inc., and Steve Jobs by Franz A Wakefield. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 33 Declaration of F. A. Wakefield in Support of 32 MOTION for Entry of Default MOTION for Default Judgment as to Apple Inc., and Steve Jobs filed by Franz A Wakefield. (Related document(s) 32 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/4/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 32 MOTION for Entry of Default, MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Apple Inc., and Steve Jobs. filed by Franz A Wakefield. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Maxwell, Emily) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc, Steve Jobs (Maxwell, Emily) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
February 26, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 22 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 29 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing from 5/3/2010 re 22 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Enjoin. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 25, 2010 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc, Steve Jobs re 23 Request for Judicial Notice, 22 MOTION to Dismiss (Maxwell, Emily) (Filed on 2/25/2010) Modified on 2/25/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2010 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franz A Wakefield re 25 Declaration in Support, 24 MOTION to Appear by Telephone, 26 Proposed Order (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 25, 2010 Filing 26 Proposed Order re 24 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Franz A Wakefield. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 25, 2010 Filing 25 Declaration of Franz Wakefield in Support of 24 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Franz A Wakefield. (Related document(s) 24 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 25, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Franz A Wakefield. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 24, 2010 Filing 23 Request for Judicial Notice re 22 MOTION to Dismiss AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENJOINING FURTHER PRO SE COMPLAINTS WITHOUT PRIOR JUDICIAL AUTHORIZATION filed by Apple, Inc, Steve Jobs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35-1, # 36 Exhibit 35-2, # 37 Exhibit 35-3, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37, # 40 Exhibit 38, # 41 Exhibit 39, # 42 Exhibit 40, # 43 Exhibit 41, # 44 Exhibit 42, # 45 Exhibit 43, # 46 Exhibit, # 47 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Maxwell, Emily) (Filed on 2/24/2010) Modified on 2/25/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2010 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION for an order enjoining further pro se complaints without prior judicial authorization; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR AN ORDER ENJOINING FURTHER PRO SE COMPLAINTS WITHOUT PRIOR JUDICIAL AUTHORIZATION filed by Apple, Inc, Steve Jobs. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maxwell, Emily) (Filed on 2/24/2010) Modified on 2/25/2010,(counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2010 Filing 21 Proposed Order re 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David Atlas. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 16, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David Atlas ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611042403.) filed by Sarah Jessica Parker. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 15 Ex Parte Application (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Jessica Parker re 15 Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 17 Declaration of David Atlas in Support of 15 Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed bySarah Jessica Parker. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 16 Declaration of Ronald D. Arena in Support of 15 Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed bySarah Jessica Parker. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 15 Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Sarah Jessica Parker. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Sarah Jessica Parker's Ex Parte Application for and Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Judge James Ware for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as the referral judge to the case. PLEASE NOTE: ALL MATTERS PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RENOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THE CASE HAS BEEN REASSIGNED. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 2/12/2010. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re ( 10 ) Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties; ( 11 ) Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge filed by Sarah Jessica Parker (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 2/12/2010)Text modified on 2/12/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Filing 11 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Sarah Jessica Parker. (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Filing 10 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties by Sarah Jessica Parker (Arena, Ronald) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings:, ***Deadlines terminated. Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2010. Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2010 10:00 AM. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
January 13, 2010 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Steve Jobs. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sarah Jessica Parker. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 12, 2010 Clerk received mailing addresses from plaintiff to serve summons. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case Nos. C09-05420HRL and C09-05779RS are related. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/4/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Clerk mailed letter to plaintiff requesting mailing addresses for defendants, so that Summons may be served.(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009) Modified on 1/12/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2009 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2010. Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2010 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern California District Court) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties by Franz A Wakefield (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Franz A Wakefield. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for: Trademark Misappropriation, RICO Copyright Infringement (Pursuant to Anticounterfeiting Consumer Protection Act of 1996, Pub L. No 104-153 3, 110 Stat, 1386 and RICO 1962(d), Injunctive Relief and Breach of an oral Contrade made in Florida (NO PROCESS); IFPP; jury demand; against Apple, Inc, Steve Jobs, Sarah Jessica Parker. Filed by Franz A Wakefield. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009) Modified on 1/12/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wakefield v. Apple, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franz A Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Jobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Jessica Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?