Balthaser Online, Inc. v. Art Star Design LLC et al

Plaintiff: Balthaser Online, Inc.
Defendant: Art Star Design LLC, Interaria, shameblame.com and Big Jump Media, Inc.
Counter-defendant: Balthaser Online, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv05422
Filed: November 20, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2011 563 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT HOOKUMU, INC., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/30/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 4, 2011 561 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 560 TO CONTINUE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING AND FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claim Construction Hearing set for 4/6/2011 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/4/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
January 24, 2011 559 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 558 TO CONTINUE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING AND FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claim Construction Hearing set for 3/9/2011 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/24/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
December 21, 2010 556 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 554 DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ELECTRONIC ARTS,INC. Stipulation filed by Balthaser Online, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/21/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 9, 2010 551 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 550 ON DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT THE KNOT, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/9/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
December 3, 2010 549 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 546 ON DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CAPCOM USA, INC. Stipulation filed by Balthaser Online, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/3/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
November 30, 2010 540 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 516 DISMISSING DEFENDANT Hi5 NETWORKS,INC. Stipulation filed by Balthaser Online, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/30/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 24, 2010 535 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT NIKE, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/24/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 22, 2010 531 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 527 ON DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT LIVE JOURNAL, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/22/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
October 29, 2010 515 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT PUMA NORTH AMERICA, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/28/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 28, 2010 513 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT GAIA INTERACTIVE, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/28/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 19, 2010 509 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 482 DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/19/10. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
September 27, 2010 499 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 494 REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 09/27/10. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 17, 2010 491 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING CIVIL L.R. 6-2 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING AND ENLARGING TIME TO OPPOSE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/17/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 3, 2010 486 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ON DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT NING, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/3/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
July 26, 2010 480 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ON DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT INSIDER GUIDES, INC. stipulation filed by Balthaser Online, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
May 11, 2010 459 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 458 OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT SWATCHBOX TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/11/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
April 14, 2010 453 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/14/10. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
March 30, 2010 443 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 416 , 421 GRANTING MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/30/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 17, 2010 430 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT IMEEM, INC. re 427 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/15/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 15, 2010 428 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (granting 426 ). The Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2010 is CONTINUED to 4/9/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 402 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 396 GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR IMEEM, INC.(jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 8, 2010 400 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT FRIENDSTER, INC. re 389 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/4/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balthaser Online, Inc. v. Art Star Design LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balthaser Online, Inc.
Represented By: Cindy Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Balthaser Online, Inc.
Represented By: Cindy Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Star Design LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shameblame.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Jump Media, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher John Akin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?