Steshenko v. McKay et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Nicholas Steshenko
Defendant: Thomas McKay, Dorothy Nunn, Anne Lucero, Cabrillo Community Collge Distrist, Kristine Scopazzi, Berthalupe Carrillo and Watsonville Community Hospital
Case Number: 5:2009cv05543
Filed: November 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 ORDER RE TRANSCRIPT REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/15/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 1045 Motion (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 ORDER granting motion for transcript at public expense. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/28/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 1001 Motion for transcript at public expense. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 ORDER RE FURTHER SUBMISSION ON ISSUE OF CONTINUING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/15/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTINUATION OF IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/13/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 ORDER RE INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/2/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/1/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 990 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO SEEK RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/30/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 987 ORDER by Judge Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 986 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 976 ORDER RE AGE, SEX, AND NATIONAL ORIGIN DISCRIMINATION CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/18/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 968 ORDER DIRECTING COURT TO FURNISH BREAKFAST FOR THE JURY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/16/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 963 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO SEEK RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/13/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 949 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 946 Motion to Change Venue; denying 947 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 948 Motion to Record. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 943 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 932 Motion to Disqualify. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 936 ORDER RE FILING UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 2/12/2015. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 923 ORDER by Judge Seeborg denying 913 Motion for Sanctions or Summary Judgment (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 921 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/4/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER RE SUBMISSION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 912 FURTHER ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTATION OF RECORD. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/2/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 906 ORDER RE REMAINING PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/1/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 901 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL, DENYING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/26/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 898 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY AND GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 895 ; granting in part and denying in part 896 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 893 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 24, 2014 re 821 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 882 ORDER CLARIFYING IN LIMINE RULING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/20/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 875 ORDER REQUESTING OFFERS OF PROOF RE SPOLIATION. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 11/19/2014. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 862 SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Selection/Trial set for 12/8/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 12/9/2014; 12/10/14; 12/11/14; 12/12/14, 12/15/14, 12/16/14 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/17/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 850 ORDER RE CERTAIN PENDING MOTIONS. Motions terminated: [#710, #740, #749, #750, #765, #783, #786, #787, #811]. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/14/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 805 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 30, 2014 re 790 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 708 Motion for Reconsideration (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO WITHDRAW. In Camera Hearing set for 8/28/2014 10:00 AM by Judge Corley in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/19/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 697 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 12/8/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 12/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/31/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO TAKE DEPOSITION UNDER RULE 30(b)(6). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/21/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER GRANTING LIMITED FURTHER DISCOVERY, VACATING TRIAL DATE, AND SETTING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE. Further Status Conference set for 7/31/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/1/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 680 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 678 SHORTENING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/24/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 672 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/1/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT ENTERED IN FAVOR OF HOSPITAL DEFENDANTS AND STRIKING COST BILL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/26/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART COLLEGE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, GRANTING HOSPITAL DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, GRANTING IN PART, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, AND SCHEDULING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE. Trial Setting Conference set for 3/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/4/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER RE PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/2/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER RE STATUS OF PROCEEDINGS DURING PENDENCY OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REASSIGN. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/23/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO SEEK RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING MOTIONS FOR CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER RE OUTSTANDING LETTER BRIEFS 522 523 525 538 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 8, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER RESETTING CASE SCHEDULE. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Corley for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/25/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER RE: PARTIES' ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 354 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 358 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 359 Motion to Compel; granting 231 Motion to Quash (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 514 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 513 AMENDING OCTOBER 16, 2012 ORDER RE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/13/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 502 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 501 AMENDING OCTOBER 16, 2012 ORDER RE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/23/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER RE FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/16/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE COLLEGE DEFENDANTS' SUMMARY JUDGMENT REPLY BRIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/1/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER by Judge Seeborg DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROPOUND ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES 431 , DENYING MOTION TO ALTER PROCEDURES FOR DISCOVERY MOTIONS 477 , CONTINUING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS 443 , 447 , 450 , 454 , 459 AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE POTENTIAL IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 9/20/2012. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS re 398 Brief filed by Sally Newell, Kristine Scopazzi, Berthalupe Carrillo, Watsonville Community Hospital. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 10, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER by Judge Seeborg denying 406 Motion to extend discovery cut-off and requesting filing of consent or declination to jurisdiction of magistrate judge (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/13/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER RE MOTION TO IMPOSE SANCTIONS FOR ALLEGED SPOILIATION OF EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/12/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER ENTERED JUNE 4, 2012. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/3/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012) Modified on 7/3/2012 (cl, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDERS ENTERED APRIL 25, 2012. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/2/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART COLLEGE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CLARIFY APRIL 25 ORDER re 320 Brief, filed by Cabrillo Community Collage District. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 22, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S JUNE 19, 2012 DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 314 Motion for Protective Order; denying 316 Motion to Quash; granting 318 Motion to Stay; denying 321 Motion for Sanctions (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012) Modified on 6/20/2012 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER RE DOCKET NO. 352. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/12/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MAY 1, 2012 DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 233 Motion to Quash; granting 234 Motion to Quash; denying 236 Motion to Quash; denying 242 Motion to Quash; finding as moot 243 Motion to Compel; denying 244 Motion to Quash; denying 246 Motion for Sanctions (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO DISQUALIFY REFERRAL JUDGE re 290 Letter filed by Gregory Nicholas Steshenko. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 11, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR "CLARIFICATION." Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER RE BRIEFING OF CHALLENGES TO DISCOVERY RULINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER RE DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 170 Motion for Protective Order; granting 171 Motion to Compel; denying 180 Motion to Compel; denying 181 Motion to Suppress; denying 182 Motion to Produce; granting in part 183 Motion to Compel; granting 192 Motion for More Definite Statement (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 251 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/29/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER TO RENOTICE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BEFORE THE ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/21/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER REVOKING PRIOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT, AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/25/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 138 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/22/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Attorney James Dal Bon for Gregory Nicholas Steshenko added. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/5/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF STESHENKO'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 125 Motion for Protective Order (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/13/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 120 Letter filed by Cabrillo Community College District. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on October 6, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER RE: 85 , 89 , 92 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 08/09/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR RULE 54(b) CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/27/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE: 76 FUTURE COURT PROCEEDINGS. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/27/2010 SHALL BE CONDUCTED BY TELEPHONE. PARTIES SHALL CALL COURT CONFERENCE AT 866/582-6878 ONE WEEK PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE TO ARRANGE FOR THEIR TELEPHONIC PARTICIPATION. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON AND APPEARNCE BY DEFENDANT SALLY NEWELL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/12/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RE: 37 , 25 , 28 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/01/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF STESHENKO'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 39 Motion for Expedited Discovery. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 50 SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON AND APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT MCKAY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 02/24/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010).
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE: 15 DENYING "MOTION TO REMOVE AND CONSOLIDATE CASES." Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/4/2010. (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE: 5 GRANTING LEAVE TO E-FILE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steshenko v. McKay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Nicholas Steshenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabrillo Community Collge Distrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Scopazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berthalupe Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watsonville Community Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?