Padayachi v. IndyMac Bank et al

Plaintiff: Yasish Mogan Padayachi
Defendant: IndyMac Bank, One West Bank and Quality Loan Service Corp.
Case Number: 5:2009cv05545
Filed: November 23, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 37 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
August 26, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 34 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge JEREMY FOGEL on 8/26/2010. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
July 23, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 24 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
April 9, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 5 , 15 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/7/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
January 20, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Schedule for Motion to Dismiss; and Extending Deadline for Parties to File Either a "Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," or a "Declination to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment." Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/20/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/20/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padayachi v. IndyMac Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasish Mogan Padayachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One West Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?