VFS Financing, Inc. v. SKF Aviation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
VFS Financing, Inc. |
Defendant: |
SKF Aviation, LLC and Frederick Scott Salyer |
Case Number: |
5:2009cv05603 |
Filed: |
November 25, 2009 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
James Ware |
Presiding Judge: |
Patricia V. Trumbull |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 28, 2010 |
Filing
49
ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Upon review of Plaintiff's submissions in support of its request for damages, the Court finds that they are insufficient. In particular, Plaintiff fails to properly show in detail its calculations for each category of damages requested. Accordingly, on or before 10/1/2010, Plaintiff shall file a Supplemental Brief detailing its calculation. Each calculation shall be cited to the relevant exhibits. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 47 MOTION for Default Judgment as to NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT : Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/28/210. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
|
April 28, 2010 |
Filing
40
ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'SMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT re 39 Case Management Statement. The Court VACATES the 5/3/2010 Case Management Conference and orders as follows: Motion Hearing set for 9/27 /2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Plaintiff shall notice its Motion in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/27/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
|
March 25, 2010 |
Filing
36
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 34 Case Management Statement. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Plaintiff shall serve this Order on Defendants. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/24/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
|
January 13, 2010 |
Filing
32
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 13, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
|
December 21, 2009 |
Filing
28
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER this TRO shall expire on 1/11/10 re 26 MOTION to Continue filed by VFS Financing, Inc.. Signed by Judge James Ware on December 21, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009) Modified on 1/13/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
|
December 9, 2009 |
Filing
24
AMENDED ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION re 17 ORDER Granting 4 Motion for Writ of Possession. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?