Interserve, Inc. et al v. Fusion Garage PTE. LTD Featured Case

Plaintiff alleges that Defendant unilaterally canceled the collaboration between itself and TechCrunch, and announced that it was going to exploit for its own exclusive benefit all that the parties had done together and cut TechCrunch out of the project and its rewards.

Plaintiff: Interserve, Inc. and CrunchPad, Inc.
Defendant: Fusion Garage PTE. LTD
Case Number: 5:2009cv05812
Filed: December 10, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2012 260 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 7278.90 against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
June 4, 2012 259 Featured Case ORDER amended order granting 246 MOTION for Default Judgment and withdrawing prior order 254 (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
May 30, 2012 258 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. Re: Bill of Costs (Short, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 24, 2012 257 BILL OF COSTS by Interserve, Inc. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/24/2012) Modified on 5/24/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2012 256 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 10, 2012 255 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor plaintiff and against defendant in the amount of $357,000. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012) Modified on 5/11/2012 (gba, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2012 254 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 253 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2012 before Judge Richard Seeborg; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. (Date Filed: 5/10/2012) re 246 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd. filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2012)
May 3, 2012 252 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 251 ***FILED IN ERROR PLEASE SEE #252***CLERKS NOTICE VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 (cl, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2012 250 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. re 249 Statement (Bloch, David) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 9, 2012 249 Statement Re Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd.'s Failure to Oppose 246 Plaintiffs' Application for Default Judgment by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bloch, David) (Filed on 4/9/2012) Modified on 4/10/2012 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2012 248 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. re 247 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Application for Default Judgment Against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd., 243 Declaration in Support, 246 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd., 242 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Plaintiffs' Application for Default Judgment Against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd., 244 Declaration in Support, 245 Proposed Order, (Bloch, David) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 23, 2012 247 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Application for Default Judgment Against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd. filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David S. Bloch, # 2 Declaration Nicholas W. Short, # 3 Proposed Order)(Bloch, David) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 23, 2012 246 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd. filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 4/6/2012. Replies due by 4/13/2012. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 23, 2012 245 Proposed Order re 243 Declaration in Support, 242 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Plaintiffs' Application for Default Judgment Against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd., 244 Declaration in Support, by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 23, 2012 244 Declaration of Nicholas W. Short in Support of 242 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Plaintiffs' Application for Default Judgment Against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd. filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 242 ) (Bloch, David) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 23, 2012 243 Declaration of Gregory J. Regan in Support of 242 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Plaintiffs' Application for Default Judgment Against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd. filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 242 ) (Bloch, David) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 23, 2012 242 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Plaintiffs' Application for Default Judgment Against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd. filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 4/6/2012. Replies due by 4/13/2012. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
February 15, 2012 241 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant Fusion Garage PTE. LTD on February 15, 2012. (Related documents(s) 239 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
February 10, 2012 240 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. Regarding Plaintiffs' Request to Clerk for Entry of Default Against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 10, 2012 239 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd. filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nicholas W. Short in Support of Plaintiffs' Request to Clerk for Entry of Default Against Defendant Fusion Garage PTE, Ltd.)(Bloch, David) (Filed on 2/10/2012) Modified on 2/14/2012 (gba, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2012 238 Minute Entry: Show Cause Hearing (Date Filed: 2/9/2012). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2012)
February 3, 2012 237 Statement Status Conference Statement by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
December 29, 2011 236 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/9/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 28, 2011 235 REPLY (re 230 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Quinn Emanuel's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. ) filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Stern, Claude) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 27, 2011 234 Statement of Non-Opposition re 230 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Quinn Emanuel's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. and Request For Further Relief filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 230 ) (Bloch, David) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 16, 2011 233 Featured Case JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DATE WRITTEN DISCOVERY RESPONSES ARE DUE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/16/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 15, 2011 232 STIPULATION Continuing Date Written Discovery Responses Are Due by CrunchPad, Inc., Fusion Garage PTE. LTD, Interserve, Inc.. (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 15, 2011 231 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 12/15/2011). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2011)
December 13, 2011 230 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Quinn Emanuel's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Claude M. Stern, # 2 Proposed Order)(Stern, Claude) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 9, 2011 229 REPLY (re 212 MOTION to Compel ) filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 8, 2011 228 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/8/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 12/8/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/8/2011)
December 2, 2011 227 Declaration of J. Caleb Donaldson in Support of 226 Response to Motion to Compel filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 226 ) (Donaldson, John) (Filed on 12/2/2011) Modified on 12/6/2011 (gba, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2011 226 RESPONSE to 212 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 12/2/2011. Replies due by 12/9/2011. (Donaldson, John) (Filed on 12/2/2011) Modified on 12/6/2011 (gba, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2011 225 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Fusion Garage PTE. LTD, Interserve, Inc.. (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 29, 2011 224 Featured Case ORDER MODIFYING JOINT STIPULATION SETTING HEARING DATE ON FUSION GARAGE'S MOTION TO COMPEL re 223 Stipulation filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Fusion Garage PTE. LTD, Interserve, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 29, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 23, 2011 223 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE ON FUSION GARAGE'S MOTION TO COMPEL by CrunchPad, Inc., Fusion Garage PTE. LTD, Interserve, Inc.. (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 21, 2011 222 Featured Case ORDER RE SCHEDULING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/21/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 18, 2011 221 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Revised Scheduling Order by CrunchPad, Inc., Fusion Garage PTE. LTD, Interserve, Inc.. (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 4, 2011 220 NOTICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Fusion Garage PTE. LTD, Interserve, Inc. Joint Report To The Court Regarding Settlement (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
October 21, 2011 219 STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement by CrunchPad, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 11, 2011 218 Featured Case ORDER RE 217 JOINT REPORT TO THE COURT REGARDING SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/11/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 7, 2011 217 STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement by CrunchPad, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 23, 2011 216 Featured Case JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 215 SEEKING STAY PENDING SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 22, 2011 215 STIPULATION Seeking Stay Pending Settlement and [Proposed] Order by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 19, 2011 214 NOTICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Fusion Garage PTE. LTD, Interserve, Inc. to Court Regarding Private Mediation (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 9, 2011 213 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 212 MOTION to Compel (Stake Declaration) filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stake Exs. A-Q, # 2 Exhibit Stake Exs. R-U, # 3 Exhibit Stake Exs. V-W)(Related document(s) 212 ) (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 212 MOTION to Compel filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/23/2011. Replies due by 9/30/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Request for Judicial Notice, Ex. 1, # 4 Affidavit Sohn, # 5 Exhibit Sohn Ex. 1, # 6 Exhibit Sohn Ex. 2)(Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
August 8, 2011 211 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mark LeHocky as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
July 29, 2011 210 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO PANEL MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 26, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 7/26/11. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
June 27, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 6/27/11. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 7/26/11 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that all parties shall call 605-477-3000 and use access code 560060. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011) Modified on 6/27/2011 (sgd, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated*** Case Management Statement Due date of 04/23/2010 Date Terminated 182 . (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 13, 2011 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 6/27/11 is now set for 11:00 a.m. and not 9:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that all parties shall call 605-477-3000 and use access code 560060. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
May 2, 2011 209 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AMENDED ANSWER. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 29, 2011 208 MOTION to Strike 207 Amended Answer to Complaint filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 14, 2011 207 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Supporting Exhibits Thereto byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Watson, Thomas) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
March 31, 2011 206 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2011 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2012 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 5/29/2012 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 5/29/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/31/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 205 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/31/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 3/31/2011). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/31/2011)
March 30, 2011 ADR Remark: A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 6/27/11 at 9:00 a.m. (PST) Please note that all parties shall call 605-477-3000 and use access code 560060. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 30, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 3/29/11. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (sgd, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 204 Featured Case ORDER RE ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/28/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 25, 2011 203 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Portions of Fusion Garage's Answer and Counterclaim filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 202 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 3/29/11 at 2:30 p.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 605-477-3000 and use access code 560060 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 24, 2011 201 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) submitted jointly (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 24, 2011 200 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Plaintiffs (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 24, 2011 199 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Fusion Garage PTE Ltd. (Watson, Thomas) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 24, 2011 198 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 10, 2011 197 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 196 Stipulation filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Fusion Garage PTE. LTD, Interserve, Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2011 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 9, 2011 196 STIPULATION & [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference by CrunchPad, Inc., Fusion Garage PTE. LTD, Interserve, Inc.. (Watson, Thomas) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 1, 2011 195 Fusion Garage's ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Stern, Claude) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 9, 2011 194 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT. Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/9/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
December 27, 2010 193 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 22, 2010 192 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING FUSION GARAGE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 153 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
October 29, 2010 191 CLERKS NOTICE MOTION HEARING SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 21, 2010 190 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Fusion Garage's Reply to Motion To Dismiss Fraud and Unfair Competition Claims filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Watson, Thomas) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 189 Reply to Opposition re 181 MOTION to Dismiss Fraud and Deceit and Unfair Competition Claims filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Watson, Thomas) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 188 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FUSION GARAGE TO PRODUCE REDACTED SOURCE CODE re 187 Stipulation filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on October 21, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 20, 2010 187 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Granting Extension of Time Regarding Fusion Garage's Production of Redacted Source Code by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Watson, Thomas) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 14, 2010 186 Certificate of Interested Entities by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. (Amended) (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 14, 2010 185 Memorandum in Opposition re 181 MOTION to Dismiss Fraud and Deceit and Unfair Competition Claims filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 6, 2010 184 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT FUSION GARAGE'S RENEWED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
September 30, 2010 183 Reply Memorandum re 164 MOTION to Compel Withheld Information and Documents filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Scherb Reply Declaration)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 182 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/30/2010, before Judge Patricia Trumbull. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2010. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 27, 2010 181 MOTION to Dismiss Fraud and Deceit and Unfair Competition Claims filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 23, 2010 180 EXHIBITS re 179 Memorandum in Opposition, Exhibit G filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 179 ) (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 179 Memorandum in Opposition re 164 MOTION to Compel Withheld Information and Documents filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Joshua L. Sohn, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 22, 2010 178 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME REAGRDING BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL re 177 Stipulation filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on September 22, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 21, 2010 177 STIPULATION re 164 MOTION to Compel Withheld Information and Documents and [PROPOSED] Order to Extend Time Regarding Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Watson, Thomas) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 16, 2010 176 Declaration of Patrick C. Doolittle in Further Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Re-filed pursuant to order dated 9/10/2010) filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (with redactions), # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 175 Declaration of Patrick C. Doolittle in Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Re-filed pursuant to order dated 9/10/2010) filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 174 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Re-filed pursuant to order dated 9/10/2010) filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 173 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. (re sealed materials re-filed pursuant to order dated 9/10/2010) (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 172 REDACTION to 117 Supplemental Bridges Declaration in Support of Preliminary Injunction (Re-filed pursuant to order dated 9/10/2010.) by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 171 REDACTION to 109 Reply Memorandum, Bridges Declaration (Re-filed pursuant to order dated 9/10/2010.) by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 170 REDACTION to 109 Reply Memorandum, (Re-filed pursuant to order dated 9/10/2010.) by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 169 REDACTION to 81 Memorandum in Opposition, Scherb Declaration (Re-filed pursuant to order dated 9/10/2010.) by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 168 REDACTION to 81 Memorandum in Opposition, (Re-filed pursuant to order dated 9/10/2010.) by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 13, 2010 167 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. Filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 166 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SEALING, AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/13/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 165 Featured Case ORDER RE: 117 GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/13/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 7, 2010 164 MOTION to Compel Withheld Information and Documents filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Scherb Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 30, 2010 163 RESPONSE to re 161 Notice (Other) Regarding Submitted Matters: Fusion Garage's Renewed Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. No. 93) by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Stake, Sam) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 24, 2010 162 Featured Case ORDER RE: 103 , 20 , 26 DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 08/24/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 161 NOTICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. re 93 MOTION for Protective Order NOTICE RE SUBMITTED MATTERS: FUSION GARAGE'S RENEWED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER [CIVIL L.R. 7-13] (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
June 30, 2010 160 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/30/2010 before Judge Patricia V. Trumbull (Date Filed: 6/30/2010) re 93 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/30/2010)
June 18, 2010 159 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 17, 2010 158 STIPULATION re 93 MOTION for Protective Order (to move hearing date) by CrunchPad, Inc., Fusion Garage PTE. LTD, Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 15, 2010 157 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING SEALING by CrunchPad, Inc., Fusion Garage PTE. LTD, Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 10, 2010 156 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion re Dkt. 133 filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 4, 2010 155 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 154 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD re 152 Declaration in Opposition (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 3, 2010 153 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Jonathan Bloom's Declaration filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 152 DECLARATION of Jonathan Bloom in Opposition to 133 MOTION to Compel filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Related document(s) 133 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 151 DECLARATION of Evette D. Pennypacker in Opposition to 133 MOTION to Compel filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 133 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 150 Memorandum in Opposition re 133 MOTION to Compel filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 2, 2010 149 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2 TO ENLARGE TIME FOR BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DE-DESIGNATION OF DOCUMENTS re 148 Stipulation filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on June 2, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 1, 2010 148 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2 TO ENLARGE TIME FOR BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DE-DESIGNATION OF DOCUMENTS by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 27, 2010 147 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FUSION GARAGE'S MOTION TO CHALLENGE PLAINTIFFS' CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS FOR THEIR RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 66 Motion to Unseal Document (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 25, 2010 146 Declaration of Evette D. Pennypacker in Support of 145 Reply Memorandum filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 145 ) (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 145 Reply Memorandum re 93 MOTION for Protective Order In Support Of Fusion Garage's Renewed Motion For Protective Order filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 144 Declaration of Evette D. Pennypacker in Support of 143 Reply Memorandum filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 143 ) (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 143 Reply Memorandum In Support Of Fusion Garage's Further Challenges To Confidentiality Designations From Transcript Of Techcrunch 30(B)(6) Deposition filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 21, 2010 142 RESPONSE to re 122 Notice (Other) re Defendant's Further Challenges to Designations by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 18, 2010 141 Memorandum in Opposition re 93 MOTION for Protective Order filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Scherb Declaration)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 18, 2010 140 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING FUSION GARAGE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 124 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 17, 2010 139 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-13-10, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2010. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 14, 2010 138 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. Proof of Service Re: Lodged Under Seal Versions of Docket No.'s 133 and 135 (Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 13, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 133 MOTION to Compel; Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2010 10:00 AM. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 137 Proposed Order re 135 Declaration in Support, 133 Notice (Other) [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Seal (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel De-Designation of Document; and Declaration of Nicholas Short In Support) by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 136 Proposed Order re 135 Declaration in Support, 133 Notice (Other) [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Seal (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel De-Designation of Documents; and Declaration of Nicholas Short in Support) by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 135 Declaration of Nicholas Short in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel De-Designation of Documents filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 134 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/13/2010 before Judge Richard Seeborg Date Filed: 5/13/2010) (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 133 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel De-Designation of Documents by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/10 10:00 AM (Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/13/2010) Modified on 5/14/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2010 132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel De-Designation of Documents; and Declaration of Nicholas Short in Support) filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 131 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD re 128 Declaration in Opposition, (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit B to Supplemental Doolittle Declaration Under Seal filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 129 NOTICE by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD re 127 Memorandum in Opposition Conditional Notice of Withdrawal re: Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 128 DECLARATION of Patrick Doolittle in Opposition to 72 Memorandum in Opposition Supplemental Declaraton in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (under seal), # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 72 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 12, 2010 127 Memorandum in Opposition re 117 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD re 123 Declaration in Support, 122 Notice (Other) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 125 NOTICE by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD re 123 Declaration in Support, 122 Notice (Other) Manual Filing Notification (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 124 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal its Notice of Further Challenges to Confidentiality Designations from Transcript of TechCrunch 30(b)(6) Deposition and Supporting Exhibits filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 123 Declaration of Patrick C. Doolittle in Support of 122 Notice (Other) filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 122 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 122 NOTICE by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD of Further Challenges to Confidentiality Designations from Transcript of TechCrunch 30(b)(6) Deposition (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 121 Reply Memorandum re 103 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Extrinsic Speaking Evidence Submitted in Support of Their Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 11, 2010 120 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 116 PERMITTING USE OF EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/11/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. re 117 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 118 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re 117 filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 117 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Motion for Leave, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Supp. Bridges Decl. in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion, # 4 Supp. Bridges Decl. in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion (REDACTED VERSION), # 5 Supp. Teare Decl. in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 116 STIPULATION Joint Stipulated Request to Permit Use of Equipment in the Courtroom by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 10, 2010 115 Declaration in Support of 104 MOTION to Seal Document 102 Reply Memorandum filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Related document(s) 104 ) (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 10, 2010 114 Memorandum in Opposition re 103 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Extrinsic Speaking Evidence Submitted in Support of Their Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 7, 2010 113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD re 102 Reply Memorandum (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 6, 2010 112 Featured Case ORDER RE: 108 GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ENLARGED BRIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/6/10.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 4, 2010 111 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. re 109 Reply Memorandum, (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 3, 2010 110 MOTION to Seal Document 109 Reply Memorandum, filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Scherb Declaration, # 2 Bloch Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 109 Reply Memorandum in Support of 26 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Brief, # 2 Bridges Declaration, # 3 Bridges Declaration Exhs. F, M, Y, Z, BB, CC, FF, # 4 Bridges Declaration Exhs.A-E, G-L, N-X, AA, DD, and EE)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 5/3/2010) Modified on 5/4/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2010 108 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Reply in Support of Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Scherb Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 107 Declaration in Support of 76 MOTION to Seal Document 72 Memorandum in Opposition, 73 Declaration in Support, filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Related document(s) 76 ) (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 106 NOTICE by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD re 102 Reply Memorandum (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 105 Declaration of Patrick C. Doolittle in Support of 104 MOTION to Seal Document 102 Reply Memorandum filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 104 MOTION to Seal Document 102 Reply Memorandum filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 103 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Extrinsic Speaking Evidence Submitted in Support of Their Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 102 Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's 20 Motions to Dismiss, to Strike, and for a More Definite Statement filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 5/3/2010) Modified on 5/4/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2010 101 EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 30, 2010 100 Featured Case ORDER DISSOLVING APRIL 28, 2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on April 30, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 99 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING FUSION GARAGE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 95 Motion to Seal Document 95 MOTION to Seal Document 93 MOTION for Protective Order, 94 Declaration in Support, (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD re 93 MOTION for Protective Order, 94 Declaration in Support, (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 97 NOTICE by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD re 93 MOTION for Protective Order, 94 Declaration in Support, Manual Filing Notification (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 96 Declaration of Patrick C. Doolittle in Support of 95 MOTION to Seal Document 93 MOTION for Protective Order, 94 Declaration in Support, filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 95 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 95 MOTION to Seal Document 93 MOTION for Protective Order, 94 Declaration in Support, filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 94 Declaration of Patrick C. Doolittle in Support of 93 MOTION for Protective Order filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 93 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 93 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 92 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 91 Declaration in Support of 69 MOTION to Seal filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Related document(s) 69 ) (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 90 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF INTERSERVE, INC.'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENA TO NON-PARTY MCGRATH/POWER PUBLIC RELATIONS re 53 First MOTION to Compel and to Enforce Subpoena filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on April 30, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 28, 2010 89 EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 88 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull finding as moot 70 Motion to Shorten Time (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 27, 2010 87 Reply Memorandum re 66 MOTION to Unseal Document from Transcript of TechCrunch 30(B)(6) Deposition filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 86 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL(REPLY RE MOTION TO ENFORCE) by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 84 Motion to Seal (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 13, 2010 64 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 63 SETTING NEW HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing continued to 5/13/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco..Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/13/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 12, 2010 63 STIPULATION Request and [Proposed] Order Setting New Hearing Date on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Related Briefing Schedules by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 9, 2010 62 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FUSION GARAGE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 23 Motion for Protective Order. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 61 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT FUSION GARAGE'S MOTION TO COMPEL; ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 60 Declaration of Patrick C. Doolittle in Support of 59 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 59 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 59 Memorandum in Opposition re 53 First MOTION to Compel and to Enforce Subpoena filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 8, 2010 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re 47 First MOTION to Compel Documents filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 7, 2010 57 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF INTERSERVE, INC.'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Shorten Time (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 6, 2010 56 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
April 6, 2010 55 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FUSION GARAGE'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 49 Motion to Shorten Time (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
April 5, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 47 First MOTION to Compel Documents. Motion Hearing reset for 5/11/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 54 Cross MOTION to Shorten Time and RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 53 First MOTION to Compel and to Enforce Subpoena filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Bloch Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 52 Memorandum in Opposition re 47 First MOTION to Compel Documents filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 51 NOTICE OF ERRATA by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD re 47 First MOTION to Compel Documents (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/5/2010) Modified on 4/6/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2010 50 RE-NOTICE by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD re 47 First MOTION to Compel Documents (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/5/2010) Modified on 4/6/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2010 49 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion to Compel filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 2, 2010 48 Declaration of Patrick Doolittle in Support of 47 First MOTION to Compel Documents filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 47 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 2, 2010 47 First MOTION to Compel Documents filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 2, 2010 46 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Fusion Garage PTE. LTD, Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 1, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss , Motion to Strike, and Motion for a More Definite Statement, 26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; Motion Hearing reset for 5/6/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 45 Featured Case ORDER RE: 40 and 42 GRANTING FUSION GARAGE'S MOTION TO CHANGE HEARING DATE TO 5/6/10 AT 1:30 P.M. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/1/10.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 44 Featured Case *****FILED IN ERROR PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER 45****ORDER GRANTING 40 FUSION GARAGE'S MOTION TO CHANGE HEARING DATE to 5/6/2010 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/1/10.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010) Modified on 4/1/2010 (cl, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2010 43 Memorandum in Opposition re 42 Amended MOTION to continue the hearing to May 27, 2010 or another date convenient on the Court's calendar filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 42 Amended MOTION to continue the hearing to May 27, 2010 or another date convenient on the Court's calendar filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 30, 2010 41 Declaration of Patrick C. Doolittle in Support of 40 MOTION to reset hearing to May 6, 2010 or another later date that is convenient to the Court's calendar filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Related document(s) 40 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 40 MOTION to reset hearing to May 6, 2010 or another later date that is convenient to the Court's calendar filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 20, 2010 39 Re-notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 3/20/2010) Modified on 3/22/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2010 37 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 16, 2010, before Judge Patricia V. Trumbull. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgina Galvan Colin, Telephone number (408) 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2010. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 18, 2010 38 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Honorable Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Honorable James Ware no longer assigned to case. All subsequent hearings shall be held in Courtroom 3 on the 17th Floor of the United States Courthouse, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California. Signed by The Executive Committee on 3/18/2010. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 16, 2010 36 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/16/2010 before Judge Patricia V. Trumbull (Date Filed: 3/16/2010) re 23 MOTION for Protective Order Pending Plaintiff's Identification of its Allegedly Misappropriated Trade Secrets; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. The matter is taken under submission. (Court Reporter Gina Galvan Colin.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/16/2010)
March 11, 2010 35 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 34 Proposed Order filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on March 11, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 10, 2010 34 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 9, 2010 33 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SHORTEN TIME RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge James Ware denying 27 Motion to Shorten Time (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 2, 2010 32 Declaration of Patrick C. Doolittle in Support of 31 Reply to Response to Motion, for Protective Order filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 31 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 2, 2010 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION for Protective Order Pending Plaintiff's Identification of its Allegedly Misappropriated Trade Secrets; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 1, 2010 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 23, 2010 29 Memorandum in Opposition re 23 MOTION for Protective Order Pending Plaintiff's Identification of its Allegedly Misappropriated Trade Secrets; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Bloch Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 23, 2010 28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Change Time of Hearing on Plaintiffs' 26 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 2/23/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 27 MOTION to Shorten Time re 26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Bloch Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Arrington Declaration, # 2 Bloch Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 25 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference re 20 Motion to Remand. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2010. Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 5, 2010 24 Declaration of Patrick Doolittle in Support of 23 MOTION for Protective Order Pending Plaintiff's Identification of its Allegedly Misappropriated Trade Secrets; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 5, 2010 23 MOTION for Protective Order Pending Plaintiff's Identification of its Allegedly Misappropriated Trade Secrets; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
January 28, 2010 22 Declaration of Patrick C. Doolittle in Support of 20 MOTION to Dismiss , Motion to Strike, and Motion for a More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 21 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 20 , 21 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 28, 2010 21 Request for Judicial Notice re 20 MOTION to Dismiss , Motion to Strike, and Motion for a More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Related document(s) 20 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 28, 2010 20 MOTION to Dismiss , Motion to Strike, and Motion for a More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 1/28/2010) Modified on 1/29/2010,(counsel failed to properly select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF INTERSERVE, INC.'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion for Discovery. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 6, 2010 18 EXHIBIT A re: 11 Motion for expedited discovery (Bloch, David) (Filed on 1/6/2010) Modified on 1/7/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2009 17 CLERKS NOTICE Setting Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due 3/12/2010. Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 29, 2009 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 29, 2009 16 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading Deadline re 9 Stipulation. Deadline to file by 1/28/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 29, 2009 15 Declaration in Support of 14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Expedited Discovery; Exhibit A Attached filed byFusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 29, 2009 14 Memorandum in Opposition to 11 Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 12/29/2009) Modified on 12/30/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2009 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 12 Declaration of David S. Bloch in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Allow Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference on an Expedited Basis filed byCrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 11 ) (Bloch, David) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 11 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion to Allow Discovery Before Rule 26 Conference on an Expedited Basis [L.R. 6-3(a)] filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bloch, David) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. re 9 Stipulation Regarding Responsive Pleading Deadline [Local Rule 6-1 (a)] (Bloch, David) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 9 STIPULATION Regarding Responsive Pleading Deadline [Local Rule 6-1 (a) by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 18, 2009 8 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. James Ware for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Executive Committee on 12/18/09. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. re Case Referred to ECF, 1 Complaint, 2 Summons Issued, 4 Patent/Trademark Copy, 3 ADR Scheduling Order on Fusion Garage by Personal Service on Mr. Chandrasekar Rathakrishnan (Bloch, David) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 17, 2009 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc. and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 15, 2009 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 10, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 10, 2009 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2010. Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 10, 2009 2 Summons Issued as to Fusion Garage PTE. LTD. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 10, 2009 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of the Lanham Act; Demand for Jury Trial against Fusion Garage PTE. LTD (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611039958). Filed by CrunchPad, Inc., Interserve, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interserve, Inc. et al v. Fusion Garage PTE. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interserve, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CrunchPad, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fusion Garage PTE. LTD
Represented By: Patrick C. Doolittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?