Facebook, Inc. v. Fisher et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: Jeremi Fisher, Philip Porembski, Ryan Shimeall, Choko Systems LLC, Harm, Inc., PP Web Services LLC and iMedia Online Services LLC
Case Number: 5:2009cv05842
Filed: December 14, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2011 81 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on January 26, 2011. (jflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
December 13, 2010 80 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Patrick Hennessy Notice of Change of Firm Address (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 22, 2010 79 Declaration of Joseph P. Cutler Responding to Order Directing Notice of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Confirming Notice to Defendant Porembski filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 19, 2010 78 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on November 19, 2010.
November 1, 2010 77 Brief re 76 Order FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 76 ) (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 27, 2010 76 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/27/2010.
September 21, 2010 75 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Application for and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of, Default Judgment Against Def P Porembski and PP Web Services Filed Under Seal with Declarations of Facebook Employee and J. Cutler w/Proposed Order filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 20, 2010 74 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Facebook, Inc. against iMedia Online Services LLC, Ryan Shimeall. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/8/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 73 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Facebook, Inc. against Choko Systems LLC, Jeremi Fisher. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/8/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 72 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 69 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
August 26, 2010 71 Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment on Consent (Shimeall) by Facebook, Inc.. (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 70 Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment on Consent (Fisher) by Facebook, Inc.. (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 69 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2010 09:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
July 6, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: The Case Management Conference set on 7/9/2010 is vacated. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 68 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 62 PLAINTIFF FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FROM ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/1/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 2, 2010 67 REDACTION to 58 Declaration in Support, of Administrative Request for Order Directing Release of Computer (Redacted Exhibit D to Mrazik Declaration) by Facebook, Inc.. (McCullagh, James) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 1, 2010 66 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION TO REMOVE ELECTRONIC DOCKET ENTRY 58-4 and FILE EXHIBIT D by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 64 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
June 30, 2010 65 Declaration of Ryan Mrazik in Support of 64 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document 58-4 and File Exhibit D to the Declaration of Ryan Mrazik in Support of Plaintiff Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Request for Order Directing Release of Computer Under Seal filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 64 ) (McCullagh, James) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 64 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document 58-4 and File Exhibit D to the Declaration of Ryan Mrazik in Support of Plaintiff Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Request for Order Directing Release of Computer Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCullagh, James) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 63 Declaration of James R. McCullagh in Support of 62 MOTION for Administrative Relief From Order Setting Case Management Conference filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 62 ) (McCullagh, James) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 62 MOTION for Administrative Relief From Order Setting Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCullagh, James) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 29, 2010 61 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ORDER DIRECTING RELEASE OF COMPUTER re 60 Proposed Order filed by Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on June 29, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 29, 2010 60 Proposed Order (Amended) Granting Plaintiff's Order Directing Release of Computer by Facebook, Inc.. (McCullagh, James) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 29, 2010 59 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ORDER DIRECTING RELEASE OF COMPUTER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 57 Motion Request for Order Directing Release of Computer (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 28, 2010 58 Declaration of Ryan Mzarik in Support of 57 MOTION Administrative Request for Order Directing Release of Computer filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit - Removed pursuant to Order 66 (Related document(s) 57 ) (McCullagh, James) (Filed on 6/28/2010) Modified on 6/30/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/2/2010 (spS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2010 57 MOTION Administrative Request for Order Directing Release of Computer filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCullagh, James) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 14, 2010 56 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF FACEBOOK'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26 CONFERENCE by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 53 Motion Request for Leave to Conduct Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 9, 2010 55 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 4, 2010 54 Declaration of Joseph P. Cutler in Support of 53 MOTION Leave to Conduct Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 53 ) (McCullagh, James) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 53 MOTION Leave to Conduct Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCullagh, James) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
May 11, 2010 52 Mail sent to Jeremi Fisher returned as undeliverable re 51 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
April 26, 2010 51 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT (Attachments: # 1 Default Entered) (Related documents(s) 49 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 19, 2010 50 Declaration of Joseph P. Cutler in Support of 50 Entry of Default as to Defendants' Jeremi Fisher, Philip Porembski, Ryan Shimeall, Chocko Systems, Web Services and iMedia Online Services filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 4/19/2010) Modified on 4/20/2010 (gm, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2010 49 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT and NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 48 Certificate of Service, 44 Affidavit of Service, 45 Acknowledgment of Service, 46 Acknowledgment of Service, 47 Acknowledgment of Service and Request for Entry of Default as to Defendants' Jeremi Fisher, Philip Porembski, Ryan Shimeall, Choko Systems, PP Web Services and iMedia Online Services (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 4/19/2010) Modified on 4/20/2010 (gm, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2010 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. 12/15/2009 Jerimi Fisher (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 47 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed 12/15/2009 to Choko Systems LLC Acknowledgement filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 46 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed 12/14/2009 to Philip Porembski Acknowledgement filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 45 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Proof of Service to PP Web Services LLC Acknowledgement filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 44 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Affidavit of Service served on iMedia Online Services LLC on 12/17/2006, filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
March 15, 2010 43 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 42 DOWNEY BRAND LLP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/10/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
February 1, 2010 41 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by PP Web Services LLC, Philip Porembski. (Thomas, Michael) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 21, 2010 40 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Joseph P. Cutler (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 21, 2010 39 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James R. McCullagh (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 12, 2010 38 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by PP Web Services LLC, Philip Porembski. (Thomas, Michael) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 11, 2010 37 Proposed Order re 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006615.) by Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 36 MOTION for Attorney Joseph P. Cutler for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006615.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 35 Proposed Order re 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006614.) by Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 34 MOTION for Attorney James R. McCullagh for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006614.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 8, 2010 33 STIPULATED ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL.(jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 7, 2010 32 STIPULATION Order and Preliminary Injunction by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 6, 2010 30 STIPULATED ORDER AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 29 STIPULATION ORDER AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 5, 2010 31 Second Declaration of Joseph P. Cutler in support of 14 Motion for TRO (FILED UNDER SEAL) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010) .
January 5, 2010 28 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by PP Web Services LLC, Philip Porembski. (Thomas, Michael) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 27 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 18 Motion to File Under Seal (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 4, 2010 26 Declaration of Joseph P. Cutler in Support of 25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 25 ) (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
January 4, 2010 25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
January 4, 2010 24 STIPULATION and Permanent Injunction for Ryan Shimeall and iMedia Online Services LLC by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
January 4, 2010 23 STIPULATION and Permanent Injunction for Jeremi Fisher and Choko Systems LLC by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 24, 2009 Received Proof of $5000 Bond as Required by Temporary Restraining Order. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2009)
December 22, 2009 22 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 11 Motion to File Under Seal (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 21, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 21, 2009 21 Featured Case ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 14 MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 18, 2009 Received Proposed Sealed Document. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 17, 2009 20 Proposed Order re 18 MOTION Administrative Relief for Leave to File Under Seal by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 17, 2009 19 Declaration of Joseph P. Cutler in Support of 18 MOTION Administrative Relief for Leave to File Under Seal filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 17, 2009 18 MOTION Administrative Relief for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 15, 2009 17 Proposed Order re 14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 15, 2009 16 Declaration of Joseph P. Cutler in Support of 14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 15, 2009 15 Declaration of Facebook Employee in Support of 14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 15, 2009 14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 15, 2009 13 Proposed Order re 11 MOTION Adminstrative Relief for Leave to File Under Seal by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 15, 2009 12 Declaration of Joe Cutler in Support of 11 MOTION Adminstrative Relief for Leave to File Under Seal filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 11 ) (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 15, 2009 11 MOTION Adminstrative Relief for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 14, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 14, 2009 10 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2010. Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 JF Standing Order re Pretrial Preparation, # 2 Standing Order)(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 14, 2009 9 Summons Issued as to Philip Porembski. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 14, 2009 8 Summons Issued as to Jeremi Fisher. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 14, 2009 7 Summons Issued as to Ryan Shimeall. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 14, 2009 6 Summons Issued as to Harm, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 14, 2009 5 Summons Issued as to Choko Systems LLC. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 14, 2009 4 Summons Issued as to iMedia Online Services LLC. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 14, 2009 3 Summons Issued as to PP Web Services LLC. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 14, 2009 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009). (gm, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against Choko Systems LLC, Jeremi Fisher, Harm, Inc., PP Web Services LLC, Philip Porembski, Ryan Shimeall, iMedia Online Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 54611006471.). Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. v. Fisher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremi Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Porembski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Shimeall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choko Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PP Web Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iMedia Online Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?