Garcia v. The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Jose et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Garcia
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Jose, William Sousae and Horacio Beltran
Case Number: 5:2009cv05916
Filed: December 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(A)(1) re 22 Stipulation of Dismissal. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/3/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Based on the parties' representation, the Court finds good cause to continue the Conference. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the Case Management Conference to March 21, 2011 at 10 a.m. On or before M arch 11, 2011, the parties shall file either a Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement that provides the Court with a proposed schedule as to how this case should proceed. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/27/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 10 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Garcia
Represented By: Jennifer M Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Jose
Represented By: Eric C Bellafronto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sousae
Represented By: Eric C Bellafronto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horacio Beltran
Represented By: Eric C Bellafronto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?