Software Rights Archive, LLC v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Software Rights Archive, LLC
Defendant: Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC and Lycos, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009mc80004
Filed: January 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part 1 Motion to Compel; granting in part 6 Motion to Compel. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
January 12, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 1 MOTION to Compel, 6 MOTION to Compel Rule 7-13 Notice of Submitted Matters re: Yahoo!'s Motions to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas on Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati and Murray & Murray P.C. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
April 29, 2009 Filing 30 Declaration of RICHARD S.J. HUNG in Support of 29 Response in Support, YAHOO!'S RESPONSE TO SOFTWARE RIGHTS ARCHIVE LLC'S AND DANIEL EGGER'S POST-HEARING BRIEF RE: YAHOO!'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS ON WSGR AND MURRAY filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 29, 2009 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Support YAHOO!'S RESPONSE TO SOFTWARE RIGHTS ARCHIVE LLC'S AND DANIEL EGGER'S POST-HEARING BRIEF RE: YAHOO!'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS ON WSGR AND MURRAY filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 17, 2009 Filing 28 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2009 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 4/17/2009) re 1 MOTION to Compel filed by Yahoo! Inc., 6 MOTION to Compel filed by Yahoo! Inc. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Software Rights Archieve, LLC's Statement of Recent Decision by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 26 Declaration of RICHARD S.J. HUNG ISO Yahoo!'s Motions to Compel Compliance With Subpoenas on Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati and Murray & Murray P.C. filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 25 Reply Memorandum re 1 MOTION to Compel, 6 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas on Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati and Murray & Murray P.C. filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
March 26, 2009 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C. re 23 Declaration in Support, 22 Memorandum in Opposition (Parnes, Mark) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 26, 2009 Filing 23 Declaration of Mark Parnes in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel By Yahoo! Inc. filed byWilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Parnes, Mark) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 26, 2009 Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel by Yahoo!! Inc. filed byWilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.. (Parnes, Mark) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Joseph J. De Hope, Jr. in Opposition to 1 MOTION to Compel filed byMurray & Murray, PC. (Related document(s) 1 ) (De Hope, Joseph) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 20 Memorandum in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Compel filed byMurray & Murray, PC. (De Hope, Joseph) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 17 Notice (Other) JOINT AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTIONS (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 17 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. JOINT AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTIONS (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Consolidate Pending Motions and Assign Related Miscellaneous Action to This Court. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/13/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Pursuant to Related Case Order ( 19 ). Case reassigned to District Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 15 Certificate of Interested Entities (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yahoo! Inc. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 13 Notice (Other) Continuing Hearing (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 1 MOTION to Compel, 6 MOTION to Compel Continuing Hearing (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 12 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 7 Declaration in Support, 9 Notice (Other), 8 Certificate of Service, 6 MOTION to Compel, 10 Proposed Order (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 11 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 3 Certificate of Service, 4 Notice (Other), 2 Declaration in Support, 1 MOTION to Compel, 5 Received Order (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 10 Proposed Order re 6 MOTION to Compel by Yahoo! Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES c08-3172 RMW by Yahoo! Inc. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009) Modified on 1/29/2009 (sp, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2009 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION by Yahoo! Inc. in support of 6 MOTION to Compel (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 7 Declaration of Francis C. Ho in Support of 6 MOTION to Compel filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Related document(s) 6 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Yahoo! Inc.'s Subpoena on Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 5 Received Order re 1 MOTION to Compel by Yahoo! Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES C08-3172 RMW by Yahoo! Inc. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION by Yahoo! Inc. in support of 1 MOTION to Compel (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 2 Declaration of Francis C. Ho in Support of 1 MOTION to Compel filed byYahoo! Inc. (Related document(s) 1 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Yahoo! Inc.'s Subpoena on Murray & Murray P.C. (Filing Fee $39.00; Receipt #54611004555) filed by Yahoo! Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009) Modified on 1/26/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Software Rights Archive, LLC v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Software Rights Archive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC Search & Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycos, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?