Xcentric Ventures, LLC v. Arden Featured Case
Plaintiff: Xcentric Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Elizabeth Arden
Case Number: 5:2009mc80309
Filed: December 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING RELATION OF CASES. On 4/16/2010, the parties filed a Stipulation that withdraws the motion to quash in each case. Since the parties' Stipulation effectively renders the miscellaneous actions moot, the Court finds the relation of the cases to be unnecessary. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 16 Proposed Order by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Gingras, David) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 15 STIPULATION re: Form of Protective Order by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Gingras, David) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
February 9, 2010 Filing 14 Proposed Order by Elizabeth Arden. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Erik Syverson)(Syverson, Erik) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Denying 1 Defendant ComplaintsBoard.com's Motion to Quash Subpoena. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 12 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/19/2010 before Magistrate Patricia V. Trumbull; Matter Submitted. (Date Filed: 1/19/2010) re 1 MOTION to Quash filed by Elizabeth Arden.(Court Reporter I. Rodriguez.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/19/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 10 Denying Defendant's Request for Telephone Appearance. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/15/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE by Elizabeth Arden of Request for Telephonic Appearance (Syverson, Erik) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 8, 2010 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all further discovery matters. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 01/07/10. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 6, 2010 Filing 7 Reply to Opposition filed byElizabeth Arden. (Syverson, Erik) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
December 30, 2009 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Support re 1 MOTION to Quash filed byXcentric Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Gingras, David) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 4, 2009 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing re: 1 set for 1/20/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 3, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 3, 2009 Filing 4 Proposed Order re 1 MOTION to Quash by Elizabeth Arden. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2009 Filing 3 Declaration of S. Kudrjavcev in Support of 1 MOTION to Quash filed byElizabeth Arden. (Related document(s) 1 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2009 Filing 2 Declaration of E. Syverson in Support of 1 MOTION to Quash filed byElizabeth Arden. (Related document(s) 1 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 3, 2009 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's 3rd Party Subpoena to Google, Inc.,( Filing fee $ 39.00, receipt number 54611006414.). Filed by Elizabeth Arden. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009) Modified on 12/3/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF). (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xcentric Ventures, LLC v. Arden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xcentric Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Arden
Represented By: Erik Swen Syverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?