In re Facebook Consumer Privacy Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Donald Silverstri, Dawn Keer, Kimberly Mancella, Jill Silverman Strelzin and Christopher Lemole
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv00429
Filed: January 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2010 Filing 31 CLERKS NOTICE The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(A) by Dawn Keer, Christopher Lemole, Kimberly Mancella, Donald Silverstri, Jill Silverman Strelzin (Lake, David) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 21, 2010 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 26 MOTION to Relate Case Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Proof of Service (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 21, 2010 Filing 28 Proposed Order re 26 MOTION to Relate Case Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related [Proposed] Order Relating Cases by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 21, 2010 Filing 27 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of 26 MOTION to Relate Case Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Declaration of Matthew D. Brown In Support of Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 26 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 21, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Relate Case Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 13, 2010 Filing 25 Request for Judicial Notice re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 23 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 Filing 24 Declaration of Ana Yang in Support of 23 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Ana Yang in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Ana Yang in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Ana Yang in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Brian M. Felgoise (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 8, 2010 Filing 21 Proposed Order re 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611007496.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611007496.) by Dawn Keer, Christopher Lemole, Kimberly Mancella, Donald Silverstri, Jill Silverman Strelzin. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 8, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney Brian M. Felgoise for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611007496.) filed by Dawn Keer, Christopher Lemole, Kimberly Mancella, Donald Silverstri, Jill Silverman Strelzin. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 8, 2010 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated Class Action) against Facebook, Inc.. Filed byDonald Silverstri, Dawn Keer, Jill Silverman Strelzin, Christopher Lemole, Kimberly Mancella. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (part 1 of 2), # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (part 2 of 2))(Lake, David) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER OR MOVE, AND PARTIES' TIME TO COMPLY WITH THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES (approving 17 ). Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/25/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 19, 2010 Filing 17 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Plaintiffs' Time to File Consolidated Complaint, Defendant's Time to Answer or Move, and Parties' Time to Comply with the Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
April 29, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2010 is continued to 5/28/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO FILE THE COMPLAINT, DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER OR MOVE, AND PARTIES' TIME TO COMPLY WITH THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES re 15 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/22/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER OR MOVE (approving 11 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/3/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 12 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of 11 Stipulation Declaration of Matthew D. Brown In Support of Stipulation Extending Plaintiffs' Time to File Consolidated Complaint and Defendant's Time to Answer or Move filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 11 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 11 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Plaintiffs' Time to File Consolidated Complaint and Defendant's Time to Answer or Move by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES AND PERMITTING FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT re 5 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/11/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 7 Motion to Relate Case (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 9, 2010 Filing 8 Proposed Order re 7 Amended MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion by Dawn Keer, Christopher Lemole, Kimberly Mancella, Donald Silverstri, Jill Silverman Strelzin. (Lake, David) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 9, 2010 Filing 7 Amended MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion filed by Dawn Keer, Christopher Lemole, Kimberly Mancella, Donald Silverstri, Jill Silverman Strelzin. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Lake, David) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 9, 2010 Filing 6 Memorandum in Opposition Defendant Facebooks Opposition To Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related; [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 4, 2010 Filing 5 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Cases for all Purposes and Permitting Filing of Consolidated Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
February 2, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE by Dawn Keer, Christopher Lemole, Kimberly Mancella, Donald Silverstri, Jill Silverman Strelzin of Related Cases (Lake, David) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
January 29, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2010. Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 JF Standing Order re Pretrial Preparation, # 2 Standing Order)(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010) (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2010 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 44611004738.). Filed byDonald Silverstri, Dawn Keer, Jill Silverman Strelzin, Christopher Lemole, Kimberly Mancella. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Facebook Consumer Privacy Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Silverstri
Represented By: David Nathan Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Keer
Represented By: David Nathan Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Mancella
Represented By: David Nathan Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Silverman Strelzin
Represented By: David Nathan Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lemole
Represented By: David Nathan Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?