izmo CRM, Inc v. Prize Corporation
Plaintiff: izmo CRM, Inc
Defendant: Prize Corporation
Case Number: 5:2010cv00518
Filed: February 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 WRIT OF EXECUTION issued in the amount of $41,078.16 against izmo CRM, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 79 Ex Parte Application (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/30/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Regarding Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/20/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying Request to Submit Additional Evidence. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/12/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Extending Mediation Deadline and Removing Case from Court-Sponsored ADR Signed By Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/9/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 17 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: izmo CRM, Inc v. Prize Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: izmo CRM, Inc
Represented By: Daniel Francis Pyne, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prize Corporation
Represented By: John DiNapoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?