Adams v. Kraft et al
Plaintiff: Berry Lynn Adams
Defendant: Daniel L Kraft, Phillip Hauck, Kirk Lingengelter, Greg Inloes, K P Best, J I Stone, Chip Bockman, R Callison, Scott Sipes and State of California
Case Number: 5:2010cv00602
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 262 Motion Transcript at the Expense of the U.S. Government.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER Regarding Respect for Jurors. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/25/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/23/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/14/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER Striking Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/13/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2012)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Preliminary Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/7/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 215 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Regarding Percipient Witness Testimony. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/4/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER Amending Trial Schedule. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/30/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 190 Motion ; striking 193 Motion in Limine; striking 194 Motion in Limine; striking 196 Motion in Limine (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER denying 176 Request for Further Trial Continuance. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/21/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 167 Motion to Appear by Telephone and Setting Case Management Conference for 12/7/11 at 2pm (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Directing Defendants to File Statement re: Trial Schedule. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/1/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 162 Motion to Postpone Pretrial Conference and Trial.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 148 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion for Summary Judgment.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 116 Motion to Dismiss; Denying 121 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Koh on 7/29/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 116 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Koh on 6/1/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 98 defendants' Motion to Compel; denying 100 defendants' Motion for Sanctions. 4/26/2011 hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Koh denying 93 Motion for Protective Order. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Koh granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Vacating March 10, 2011 Motion Hearing. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/4/2011. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re 81 Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/10/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re 65 Denying Motion for Sanctions. The December 2, 2010 motion hearing is vacated. The Case Management Conference scheduled for December 2, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. remains as set. Signed by Judge Koh on 11/30/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 63 GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT GREG INLOES WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/23/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 57 GRANTING MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/20/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT INLOES LETTER re 30 Letter filed by Greg Inloes. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 3, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Kraft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berry Lynn Adams
Represented By: M. Van Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel L Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Hauck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Lingengelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Inloes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K P Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J I Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chip Bockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Callison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Sipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?