Hibnick v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Eva Hibnick
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv00672
Filed: February 17, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1934
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2011 155 Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA re appeal 142 Notice of Appeal, : (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 154 Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA re appeal 139 Notice of Appeal, 147 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form : (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 3, 2011 153 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02-07-11, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2011. (las, ) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 152 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-04-10, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2011. (las, ) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 31, 2011 151 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 10/4/10, 2/7/11 before Judge Ware, re 144 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Transcript due by 8/1/2011. (Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 7/31/2011)
July 21, 2011 150 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 2/7/2011 before Judge James Ware, re 145 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA, 140 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 8/22/2011. (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 20, 2011 149 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Shub of Christopher A. Seeger (Seeger Weiss NY Office) (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 18, 2011 148 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form by Kervin Walsh. (Murphy, Martin) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 13, 2011 147 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 10/04/10; 02/07/11 before Judge James Ware, (Davis, John) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 6, 2011 146 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Megan Marek (Attachments: # 1 DAR, # 2 Judgment, # 3 Judgment)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 145 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Steven Cope (Attachments: # 1 DAR, # 2 Judgment, # 3 Judgment, # 4 Judgment)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 144 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Tanya Rudgayzer (Attachments: # 1 DAR, # 2 Judgment, # 3 Judgment, # 4 Judgment)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 143 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Brent Clifton, Warren Sibley (Attachments: # 1 DAR, # 2 Judgment, # 3 Judgment)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 1, 2011 142 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 128 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 129 Order Granding Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Tanya Rudgayzer. Filing Fee $ 455 Paid, Receipt # 54611009970 Appeal Record due by 8/1/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 30, 2011 141 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 128 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 129 Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Brent Clifton, Warren Sibley. Filing Fee $ 455 Paid, Receipt # 54611009962 Appeal Record due by 8/1/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 140 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 136 Order Granting Final Application for Reimbursement of Expenses, 128 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 129 Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Steven Cope. Filing Fee $ 455 Paid, Receipt # 54611009959 Appeal Record due by 8/1/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 28, 2011 139 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 128 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 129 Order by Megan Marek. Filing Fee $ 455 Paid, Receipt # 34611061546.Appeal Record due by 7/28/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 27, 2011 138 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT by Kervin Walsh. (Murphy, Martin) (Filed on 6/27/2011) Modified on 6/29/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2011 137 NOTICE OF APPEAL NOTIFICATION FORM (Amended Notification Information: Appeal Fee Paid). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 22, 2011 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 34611061287 re 132 Notice of Appeal (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) Modified on 7/6/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2011 136 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPLICATION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/17/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 135 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 134 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet, # 2 cover letter, # 3 notice of appeal notification form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 133 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 16, 2011 132 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Kervin Walsh re 128 Order and 129 Order (FEE STATUS: PAID, Receipt Number 34611061287) (Attachments: # 1 Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; Approval of Cy Pres Awards; and Awarding Attorney Fees, # 2 Amended Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; Approval of Cy Pres Awards; and Awarding Attorney Fees)(Murphy, Martin) (Filed on 6/16/2011) Modified on 6/16/2011 (far, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/17/2011 (far, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/24/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2011 131 Declaration of Gary E. Mason in Support of 130 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Class Counsel's Final Application for Reimbursement of Expenses filed byJohn Case, Eva Hibnick, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Mason LLP Expenses, # 2 Exhibit 2 Rubenstein Declaration and Expenses)(Related document(s) 130 ) (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 130 NOTICE by John Case, Eva Hibnick, Nathan Kassebaum, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner Class Counsel's Final Application for Reimbursment of Expenses (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mason, Gary) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 2, 2011 129 Featured Case Amended ORDER re 128 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 2, 2011. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 31, 2011 128 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 61 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment; granting 65 Motion for Attorney Fees (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
April 12, 2011 127 Response to the objections to Class Counsels March 25 submission and to the Electronic Privacy Information Center's (EPIC's) April 7 reply on behalf of EPIC and seven others. re 120 Proposed Order by Richard Sobel. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 11, 2011 126 *** FILED IN WRONG CASE. NO NEW DOCUMENT. *** Brief For Amicus Curiae Electronic Privacy Information Center In Support of Plaintiffs filed byElectronic Privacy Information Center. (Chavez, Mark) (Filed on 4/11/2011) Modified on 4/12/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2011 125 REPLY in Support of OBJECTION TO CLASS counsel's proposed Cy Pres Distribution ) filed by Electronic Privacy Information Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Friedman, Philip) (Filed on 4/8/2011) Modified on 4/11/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2011 124 REPLY (re 61 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Notice of Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Order Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, and Appointing Class Representatives and Class Counsel ) filed byJohn Case, Eva Hibnick, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Cy Pres Awards)(Mason, Gary) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 123 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Megan Marek. (Kendrick, James) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 30, 2011 122 OBJECTIONS to re 120 Proposed Order and Final Judgment by Alison Jackson, Tanya Rudgayzer, Jon M. Zimmerman. (Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 3/30/2011) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2011 121 OBJECTIONS to re 120 Proposed Order by Electronic Privacy Information Center. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2, # 3 Appendix 3, # 4 Appendix 4, # 5 Appendix 5, # 6 Appendix 6, # 7 Appendix 7, # 8 Appendix 8, # 9 Appendix 9, # 10 Appendix 10, # 11Appendix 12, # 12 Appendix 13, # 13 Appendix 11)(Friedman, Philip) (Filed on 3/30/2011) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2011 120 Proposed Order and Final Judgment Granting 119 Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Awarding Attorneys' Fees by Eva Hibnick. (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 3/25/2011) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2011 119 Cy Pres Organizations and Distribution Amounts for Court Approval filed by Eva Hibnick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Class Counsel's Submission of Cy Pres Organizations, # 2 Exhibit B to Class Counsel's Submission of Cy Pres Organizations, # 3 [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Awarding Attorneys' Fees)(Ram, Michael) (Filed on 3/25/2011) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2011 118 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Susan D. Fahringer (Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 16, 2011 117 Featured Case ORDER Re. Nomination Process for Cy Pres Recipients. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 16, 2011. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 14, 2011 116 Featured Case ORDER Granting Renewed 115 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel A. Osborn. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 10, 2011 115 RENEWED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel A. Osborn filed by Tanya Rudgayzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) related document 109 MOTION (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011) Modified on 2/11/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2011 114 *** CLERK'S ERROR *** please ignore (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011) Modified on 2/10/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 2/11/2011,(posted in the wrong case number.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2011 113 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 95 Motion to Continue (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 7, 2011 112 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2011 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 2/7/2011) re 61 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Notice of Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Order Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, and Appointing Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed by Lauren Maytin, John Case, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams, Barry Feldman, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, 65 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion; Class Counsel's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Lauren Maytin, John Case, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams, Barry Feldman, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 111 Featured Case ORDER Denying without Prejudice 109 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel A. Osborn. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/7/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 4, 2011 110 Brief re 104 Reply Memorandum,, 79 Objection Surreply Supporting Objection of Steven Cope to Proposed Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear filed bySteven Cope. (Related document(s) 104 , 79 ) (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 109 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel A. Osborn ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009049.) filed by Tanya Rudgayzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 108 Featured Case ORDER Granting 103 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alan J. Statman. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 107 Featured Case ORDER Granting 102 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffery P. Harris. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 2, 2011 106 EXHIBITS re 105 Declaration in Support, filed byJohn Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 10, # 7 Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit 12, # 9 Exhibit 13, # 10 Exhibit 14, # 11 Exhibit 15, # 12 Exhibit 16, # 13 Exhibit 17, # 14 Exhibit 18, # 15 Exhibit 19, # 16 Exhibit 20, # 17 Exhibit 21, # 18 Exhibit 22, # 19 Exhibit 23, # 20 Exhibit 24, # 21 Exhibit 25, # 22 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) 105 ) (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 2, 2011 105 Declaration of Gary E. Mason in Support of 104 Reply Memorandum,, in Further Support of Final Approval Motion and Fee Petition filed byJohn Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3-1, # 4 Exhibit 3-2, # 5 Exhibit 3-3)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 2, 2011 104 Reply Memorandum re 61 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Notice of Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Order Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, and Appointing Class Representatives and Class Counsel, 65 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion; Class Counsel's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed byJohn Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Mason, Gary) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
January 27, 2011 103 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alan J. Statman ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009009.) filed by Alison Jackson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 102 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffery P. Harris ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009008.) filed by Alison Jackson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 26, 2011 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Hayden (Hayden, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 100 Reply to Opposition re 95 MOTION to Continue filed byMegan Marek. (Davis, John) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 25, 2011 99 Memorandum in Opposition to Class Member Marek's 95 Request for Continuance or in the Alternative Request for Telephonic Appearance filed by Google Inc.. (Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/25/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 98 Memorandum in Opposition re 95 MOTION to Continue filed byJohn Case, Eva Hibnick, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner. (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 97 Proposed Order re 95 Request for Telephonic Appearance by Megan Marek. (Davis, John) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/25/2011,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 96 Proposed Order re 95 MOTION to Continue by Megan Marek. (Davis, John) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 95 MOTION to Continue or, in the alternative, MOTION for telephonic appearance filed by Megan Marek. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Davis, John) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/25/2011,(counsel failed to properly select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2011 94 NOTICE of Appearance by John William Davis (Davis, John) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 21, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 61 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Notice of Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Order Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, and Appointing Class Representatives and Class Counsel, 65 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion; Class Counsel's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 21, 2011 93 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing from 1/31/2011 re 61 Final Fairness Hearing; 65 Motion for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 14, 2011 92 Letter from Gail Beasley dated 1/8/11. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 11, 2011 91 Featured Case ORDER Granting 87 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marina Trubitsky. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 10, 2011 90 NOTICE of Intent to Appear on Behalf of Objector Tanya Rudgayzer related document 80 (Osborn, Daniel) (Filed on 1/10/2011) Modified on 1/11/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 89 OBJECTIONS to re 50 Order on Motion for Settlement, to Attorney's Fees request, and Notice of intention to appear, and REQUEST to speak at the hearing. by Oleg Aronov. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 10, 2011 88 NOTICE of Appearance Oleg Aronov (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 10, 2011 87 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marina Trubitsky ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008888.) filed by Oleg Aronov. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 10, 2011 86 Letter from Karen Sue Llano dated 12/3/10. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 10, 2011 85 Declaration of J. M. Zimmerman in Support of 83 Objection filed byJon M. Zimmerman. (Related document(s) 83 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 84 Request for Judicial Notice re 83 Objection filed byJon M. Zimmerman. (Related document(s) 83 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2011: # 1 Exhibit A) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2011: # 2 Exhibit A-B) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 83 OBJECTIONS to re 50 Order on Motion for Settlement, and Notice to Appear by Jon M. Zimmerman. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Megan Marek re 81 Objection (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 81 OBJECTIONS to re 50 Order on Motion for Settlement, and Notice to Appear by Megan Marek. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 80 OBJECTIONS to 50 Order on Motion for Settlement, by Tanya Rudgayzer. (Osborn, Daniel) (Filed on 1/10/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 79 OBJECTIONS to 50 and Notice to Appear by Steven Cope. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 1/10/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 78 OBJECTIONS to 50 Order on Motion for Settlement, and to 65 MOTION for Attorneys Fees by Kervin Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A)(Murphy, Martin) (Filed on 1/10/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 77 OBJECTIONS to re 50 Order on Motion for Settlement, by Maureen M. Phillips. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 6, 2011 76 OBJECTIONS to re 50 Order on Motion for Settlement, by Erica Connolly, Ryan Murphy, Joseph Nicholson. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 6, 2011 75 NOTICE of Intent to appear Joseph Nicholson, Ryan Murphy, Erica Connolly (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 6, 2011 74 OBJECTIONS to re 50 Order on Motion for Settlement, by Alison Jackson. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2011 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Phillip Harris (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2010 72 OBJECTIONS to re 50 Order on Motion for Settlement, by Abraham Flores III. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 27, 2010 71 OBJECTIONS to re 50 Order on Motion for Settlement,. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 27, 2010 70 OBJECTIONS to re 50 Order on Motion for Settlement,. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 27, 2010 69 OBJECTIONS to re 50 Order on Motion for Settlement, by Brent Clifton and Warren Sibley. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 21, 2010 68 OBJECTIONS to re 50 Order on Motion for Settlement, by Nathan Kassebaum. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 20, 2010 67 Proposed Order re 61 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment 65 MOTION for Attorney Fees by John Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 12/20/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2010 66 Declaration of Gary E. Mson in Support of 65 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion; Class Counsel's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed byJohn Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 65 ) (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 65 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion; Class Counsel's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by John Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 64 Declaration of Brian Stoler in Support of 61 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Notice of Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Order Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, and Appointing Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed byJohn Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. (Related document(s) 61 ) (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 63 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of 61 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Notice of Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Order Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, and Appointing Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed byJohn Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. (Related document(s) 61 ) (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 62 Declaration of Susan Fahringer in Support of 61 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Notice of Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Order Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, and Appointing Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed byJohn Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. (Related document(s) 61 ) (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 61 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Notice of Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Order Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, and Appointing Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed by John Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 17, 2010 60 OBJECTIONS to re 50 Order on Motion for Settlement,. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 13, 2010 59 Letter from Clifton Jenkins Jr., dated 12/6/10. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 10, 2010 58 Letter from Tony Richardson. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 10, 2010 57 Letter from Leon Hughes. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 8, 2010 56 Letter from N. Demirdoian dated 11/4/10. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2010 55 Letter from D. Connor dated 11/4/10. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2010 54 Letter from John and Suzan Macco dated 11/3/10. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2010 53 Letter from G. L. Lambert dated 11/2/10. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2010 52 Letter from C. Roemer dated 11/2/10. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2010 51 Letter from J. T. Pusheck. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2010 *** Set Hearings re 50 Order: Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 7, 2010 50 Featured Case SECOND AMENDED ORDER Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement re 41 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/7/2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010) Modified on 10/7/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/12/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2010 49 NOTICE by John Case, Eva Hibnick, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner of Filing of Second Amended Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement amendment to 46 (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order Preliminary Approving Class action settlement) (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 10/5/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 48 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/4/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 10/4/2010). The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/4/2010)
September 30, 2010 47 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference set for 10/4/2010 at 10:00 AM is vacated in light of the hearing for Preliminary Approval on 10/4/2010 at 9:00 AM. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 29, 2010 46 NOTICE of filing of First Amended [Proposed] Order Preliminary Approving Class action settlement amendment to 41 (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order, # 2 [Proposed] Order Preliminary Approving Class action settlement Redlined)(Mason, Gary) (Filed on 9/29/2010) Modified on 9/29/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/5/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/5/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2010 45 NOTICE of Change of FIRM AFFILIATION (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/21/2010) Modified on 9/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 44 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT TO ADVANCE HEARING FOR PRELIMINARY APPRVOAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT re 43 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 41 Motion: Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 9, 2010 43 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Advance Date of Hearing for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement by John Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 3, 2010 42 Declaration of Gary E. Mason in Support of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJohn Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 41 ) (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 41 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Order (1) Prleiminarily Approving Class Action Settlement; (2) Provisionally Certifying Settlement Class and Appointing Class Counsel; (3) Authorizing Distribution of Notice of Settlement; and (4) Setting a Schedule for the Final Approval Process; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by John Case, Barry Feldman, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Rochelle Williams. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A to Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit B to Settlement Agreement, # 4 Exhibit C to Settlement Agreement, # 5 Proposed Order)(Mason, Gary) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 2, 2010 40 Featured Case ORDER Granting 35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter W. Thomas. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 25, 2010 39 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Continuing Case Management Conference from 8/30/2010 to 10/4/2010 re 36 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2010. Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 23, 2010 38 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 37 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Susan Fahringer by Google Inc.. (Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 20, 2010 37 Featured Case ORDER Granting 34 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 36 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Continuing Case Management Conference by Google Inc.. (Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 34 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Under Seal)(Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 19, 2010 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter W. Thomas ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007967.) filed by John Case, Eva Hibnick, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 33 Featured Case ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference re 32 Stipulation. All case management conference deadlines remain as previously set. The Case Management Conference remains set for August 30, 2010 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 16, 2010 32 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference by Google Inc.. (Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
July 29, 2010 31 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc.. Filed by Rochelle Williams, Barry Feldman, Andranik Souvalian, Katherine C Wagner, Lauren Maytin, Mark Neyer, John Case. (Mason, Gary) (Filed on 7/29/2010) Modified on 7/30/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2010 30 Featured Case ORDER ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES; APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND LIAISON COUNSEL. The Court consolidates the Actions--CV 10-00672, CV 10-01433, and CV 10-02509--into one action. The Clerk of Court shall consolidate these actions such that the earliest filed action, CV 10-00672, is the lead case. All future filings shall be in CV 10-00672 and bear the caption: "In re Google Buzz Privacy Litigation." Since the later actions are now consumed in the first filed action, the Clerk shall administratively close CV 10-01433 and CV 10-02509. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motions terminated: (19 in 5:10-cv-00672-JW) MOTION for entry of [Proposed] Pretrial Order No. 1 MOTION for entry of [Proposed] Pretrial Order No. 1, ***CMC Deadlines terminated re (27 in 5:10-cv-00672-JW) Stipulation, (6 in 5:10-cv-01433-JW) Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/30/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010) Modified text on 6/30/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2010 29 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER cases C10-672 JW and C10-1433 are related, Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall immediately relate Eva Hibnick, et al. v. Google, Inc., et al., Case No. CV 10-00672-JW and Barry Feldman, et al. v. Google, Inc., et al., Case No. CV 10-01433-HRL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/30/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010) Modified on 6/30/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2010 28 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. The court finds that the cases are related within the meaning of Rule 3-12(a). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall immediately relate Eva Hibnick, et al. v. Google, Inc., et al., Case No. CV 10-00672-JW and Rochelle Williams, et al. v. Google, Inc., et al., Case No. CV 10-02509-PVT. Related cases: Create association to 5:10-cv-02509-PVT. Motions terminated: 23 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Rochelle Williams. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 21, 2010 27 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference by Eva Hibnick, Andranik Souvalian, Rochelle Williams. (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 13, 2010 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rochelle Williams (Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 6/13/2010)
June 13, 2010 25 Proposed Order by Rochelle Williams. (Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 6/13/2010)
June 13, 2010 24 Declaration of Reginald Terrell filed byRochelle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Williams Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Hibnick Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Feldman Complaint, # 4 Exhibit P & A re PTO 1)(Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 6/13/2010)
June 13, 2010 23 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Rochelle Williams. (Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 6/13/2010)
May 7, 2010 22 Declaration of Gary E. Mason in Support of 19 MOTION for Entry of proposed pretrial Order No. 1 filed by Eva Hibnick, Andranik Souvalian. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 19 ) (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Modified on 5/10/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2010 21 EXHIBITS re 19 MOTION for Entry of proposed pretrial Order No. 1; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Entry of Pretrial Order No. 1 filed by Eva Hibnick, Andranik Souvalian. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 19 ) (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Modified on 5/10/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2010 20 Declaration of Michael F. Ram in Support of 19 MOTION for Entry of proposed pretrial Order No. 1 filed by Eva Hibnick, Andranik Souvalian. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 19 ) (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Modified on 5/10/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2010 19 MOTION for Entry of [proposed] pretrial Order No. 1; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Entry of Pretrial Order No. 1 filed by Eva Hibnick, Andranik Souvalian. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Pretrial Order No. 1)(Ram, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Modified on 5/10/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2010 18 Featured Case ORDER Granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David J. Burman. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andranik Souvalian re 15 Notice of Appearance of Michael D. Braun (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER Granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Albert Gidari. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Braun (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER Granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gary E. Mason. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 12, 2010 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gary E. Mason ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007160.) filed by Eva Hibnick. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 25, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER Granting 9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adel A. Nadji; William M. Audet and Jonas P Mann terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 19, 2010 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David J. Burman ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007017.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Albert Gidari ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007018.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 18, 2010 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw As Counsel of Record filed by Eva Hibnick. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw As Counsel, # 2 Proof of Service)(Audet, William) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. re 7 Notice of Appearance Google Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Parties (Leider, Philip) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A. Leider (Leider, Philip) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 15, 2010 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Francis Ram (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against Google Inc.. Filed byEva Hibnick, Andranik Souvalian. (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
February 23, 2010 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eva Hibnick Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint (Audet, William) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 22, 2010 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 18, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 17, 2010 3 Summons Issued as to Google Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 2 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/10. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 1 COMPLAINT (summons issued) jury demand against Google Inc. Receipt number 34611042486 (Filing fee $ 350.). Filed by Eva Hibnick. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010) Modified on 2/19/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hibnick v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Hibnick
Represented By: Donna F Solen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?