Zaidi v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sayed H Zaidi
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2010cv00698
Filed: February 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DISSOLVING STANDBY ORDER HOLDING DEFENDANT IN CONTEMPT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 17, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Standby ORDER Holding Defendant in Contempt of Court Order. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 11, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Setting Hearing Regarding 47 Defendant's Response to Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Has Not Complied with This Court's Order. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 28, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER To Show Cause Why Defendant Has Not Complied With This Court's Order. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 22, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Remanding Case for Determination on Plaintiff's Request for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 3, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Construing Complaint to Include a Cause of Action for a Writ of Mandamus, Denying in Part and Granting in Part Defendants Motion to Dismiss, and Soliciting Further Briefing Regarding the September 28, 2010 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/9/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER to Defendant to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Construed to Be an Action for a Writ of Mandamus and Summary Judgment Granted Sua Sponte Directing Defendant to Properly Act on Plaintiff's Request for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/27/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INTERIM ORDER re 13 Soliciting Further Briefing and Evidence. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/10/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re 13 Soliciting Reply From Defendant and Continuing Hearing. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/22/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 13 Extending Schedule for Motion to Dismiss ; and Extending Deadline for Parties to File Either a "Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," or a "Declination to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment." Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 6/18/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaidi v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayed H Zaidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?