Zynga Game Network, Inc. v. Williams et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Defendant: Jason Williams, Luna Martini and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 5:2010cv01022
Filed: March 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2011 Filing 52 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on June 27, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 43 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AND GRANTING 48 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on June 27, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 53 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2011 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 6/24/2011) re 48 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 43 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANTS JASON WILLIAMS, LUNA MARTINI AND WAN-WEN KUO. The motions are granted. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/24/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 50 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2011 at 9:00 AM are RESET for 6/24/2011 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
May 20, 2011 Filing 49 Declaration of David K. Caplan in Support of 48 MOTION for Attorney Fees ; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Related document(s) 48 ) (Caplan, David) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 20, 2011 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney Fees ; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit)(Caplan, David) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (granting 45 ). The Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2011 is CONTINUED to 6/24/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/10/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 46 Declaration of David K. Caplan in Support of 45 Sixth MOTION to Continue or Vacate Case Management Conference; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Related document(s) 45 ) (Caplan, David) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 45 Sixth MOTION to Continue or Vacate Case Management Conference; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit)(Caplan, David) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 44 Declaration of David K. Caplan in Support of 43 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANTS JASON WILLIAMS, LUNA MARTINI AND WAN-WEN KUO; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Related document(s) 43 ) (Caplan, David) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 43 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANTS JASON WILLIAMS, LUNA MARTINI AND WAN-WEN KUO; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit)(Caplan, David) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 42 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Jason Williams, Luna Martini and Wan-Wen Kuo (Attachments: # 1 Default Entered) (Related documents(s) 39 )(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Game Network, Inc. re 39 MOTION for Entry of Default by the clerk as to JASON WILLIAMS, LUNA MARTINI AND WAN-WEN KUO, 40 Declaration in Support (Caplan, David) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 40 Declaration of David K. Caplan in Support of 39 MOTION for Entry of Default by the clerk as to JASON WILLIAMS, LUNA MARTINI AND WAN-WEN KUO filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Related document(s) 39 ) (Caplan, David) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 39 MOTION for Entry of Default by the clerk as to JASON WILLIAMS, LUNA MARTINI AND WAN-WEN KUO filed by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Caplan, David) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 37 . Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/13/11. (dlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 5, 2011 Filing 37 Fifth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Affidavit)(Caplan, David) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 28, 2011 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Game Network, Inc. re 3 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANTS BY ELECTRONIC MAIL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on March 24, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (granting 32 ). The Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2011 is CONTINUED to 4/15/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/6/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 5, 2011 Filing 33 Declaration of David K. Caplan in Support of 32 Fourth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Caplan, David) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
January 5, 2011 Filing 32 Fourth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caplan, David) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (granting 28 ). The Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2010 is CONTINUED to 1/14/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/19/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE by Zynga Game Network, Inc. Regarding Status of Compliance with ADR Local Rule 3-5 (Caplan, David) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 11, 2010 Filing 29 Declaration of David K. Caplan in Support of 28 Third MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Caplan, David) (Filed on 10/11/2010)
October 11, 2010 Filing 28 Third MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caplan, David) (Filed on 10/11/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 27 Declaration of David K. Caplan in Support of 26 MOTION To Serve Defendants by Electronic Mail ; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9)(Related document(s) 26 ) (Caplan, David) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION To Serve Defendants by Electronic Mail ; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Authorizing Plaintiff to Serve Defendants by Electronic Mail)(Caplan, David) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to John Does 1-5, Wan-Wen Kuo, Luna Martini, Jason Williams. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE by Zynga Game Network, Inc. re 17 Order on Motion to Continue Notice Regarding Status of Compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) Service Deadline in Response to Court Order Dated July 8, 2010 (Caplan, David) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 23 ERRATA re 22 Amended Complaint by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Rose, Tara) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 7, 2010 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Does 1-5, Luna Martini, Jason Williams, Wan-Wen Kuo. Filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Rose, Tara) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (granting 18 ). The Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2010 is CONTINUED to 11/5/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/13/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE by Zynga Game Network, Inc. re 4 ADR Scheduling Order, Notice Regarding Status of Compliance with ADR Local Rule 3-5 in Response to Court Order Dated March 12, 2010 (Caplan, David) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 19 Declaration of Tara D. Rose in Support of 18 Second MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Caplan, David) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 18 Second MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Continuing Case Management Conference)(Caplan, David) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL CONTINUING FRCP 4(m) SERVICE DEADLINE. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 16 MOTION to Continue FRCP 4(m) Service Deadline filed by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Caplan, David) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (granting 12 ). The Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2010 is CONTINUED to 8/27/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/28/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF ZYNGA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Discovery (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 13 Declaration of Tara D. Rose in Support of 12 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4 to the Declaration of Tara D. Rose)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Caplan, David) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Continuing Case Management Conference)(Caplan, David) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 11 Declaration of Sean Hanley in Support of 9 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Conduct Third Party Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10 of the Declaration of Sean Hanley)(Related document(s) 9 ) (Caplan, David) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 10 Declaration of Tara D. Rose in Support of 9 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Conduct Third Party Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4 of the Declaration of Tara D. Rose)(Related document(s) 9 ) (Caplan, David) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Conduct Third Party Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Leave To Conduct Third Party Discovery)(Caplan, David) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 03/19/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 18, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings:, ***Deadlines terminated. Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States Judge by Zynga Game Network, Inc. (Varas, Christopher) (Filed on 3/18/2010) Modified on 3/18/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2010 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringemetn (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 12, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2010 02:00 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2010: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Does 1-5, Luna Martini, Jason Williams. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010) (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2010 Filing 2 Notice of Interested Parties by Zynga Game Network, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010) (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/15/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued);jury demand; against John Does 1-5, Luna Martini, Jason Williams ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611043400). Filed byZynga Game Network, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zynga Game Network, Inc. v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Represented By: David K. Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luna Martini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?