McKinney v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Mary McKinney
Defendant: Google, Inc., HTC Corp. and T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv01177
Filed: March 22, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2012 124 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Complaint(Docket Item No. 113 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 2/3/2012 at 9:00 AM has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 2/3/2012 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 12, 2012 123 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC. AND HTC CORPORATIONS STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGoogle, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Related document(s) 113 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
November 28, 2011 122 Request for Judicial Notice re 115 Request for Judicial Notice, DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC. AND HTC CORPORATION'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byGoogle, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Related document(s) 115 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 121 REPLY (re 113 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT ) DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGoogle, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 15, 2011 120 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Extend the Deadline for Defendants to Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint re 119 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Google, Inc and HTC Corporation Replies due by 11/28/2011 re 113 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/15/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 11, 2011 119 STIPULATION to Extent the Deadline for Defendants to Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint by HTC Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rosemarie T. Ring, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 11/11/2011)
November 7, 2011 118 RESPONSE to re 115 Request for Judicial Notice, by Mary McKinney, Nathan Nabors. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)(Avila, Sara) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 117 RESPONSE (re 113 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT ) filed byMary McKinney, Nathan Nabors. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint)(Avila, Sara) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
October 24, 2011 116 Declaration of ROSEMARIE T. RING in Support of 113 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGoogle, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 113 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 24, 2011 115 Request for Judicial Notice re 113 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGoogle, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 113 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 24, 2011 114 Proposed Order re 113 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Google, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 24, 2011 113 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Google, Inc., HTC Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 11/7/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 11, 2011 112 STIPULATION Regarding Response Deadline for Consolidated Amended Complaint by HTC Corp.. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 4, 2011 111 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alan M. Mansfield (Mansfield, Alan) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 30, 2011 110 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., HTC Corp. (Filing fee $ 350.). Filed by Mary McKinney, Nathan Nabors. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to Consolidated Amended Complaint)(Avila, Sara) (Filed on 9/30/2011) Modified on 9/30/2011,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2011 109 Featured Case ORDER NAMING CONSOLIDATED CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the consolidated case is titled In re Google Phone Litigation. All documents filed in the consolidated case shall be captioned accordingly and shall be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on September 30, 2011. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011) Modified on 9/30/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2011 108 Featured Case ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES, re (49 in 5:10-cv-03897-EJD) Joint Case Management Statement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned cases be consolidation. The Clerk shall consolidate these actions. Case No. 5:10-CV-01177 EJD is the earlier filed action and therefore shall be the lead case. Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Complaint no later than September 30, 2011. Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Complaint no later than September 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on September 15, 2011. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified text on 9/16/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/30/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2011 107 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REGARDING WHETHER THE MCKINNEY AND NABORS CASES SHOULD BE CONSOLIDATED 105 related document filed by Google, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 9/9/2011) Modified on 9/12/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2011 106 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 83 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Any amended complaint shall be filed no later than September 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on August 30, 2011. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011) Modified text on 8/31/2011 (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 9/1/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2011 105 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING CASE STATUS STATEMENT REGARDING WHETHER THE CASES SHOULD BE CONSOLIDATED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than September 9, 2011, the parties in both cases shall file a joint statement addressing whether the cases should be consolidated and, if so, proposing a schedule for nomination of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on August 30, 2011. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011) Modified text on 8/31/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2011 104 NOTICE by Mary McKinney of Consent to Receive ECF Notices (Mansfield, Alan) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 17, 2011 103 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docket Item No. 83 in 5:10-cv-01177-EJD and 26 in 5:10-cv-03897-EJD) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for August 19, 2011 at 9:00 AM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The August 19, 2011 hearing is hereby VACATED. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 15, 2011 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Dawn Avila (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
June 24, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 83 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 101 Order as Modified by the Court Granting 100 Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2011.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011) Modified text on 6/27/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2011 100 MOTION to Continue Hearing Date of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss filed by Mary McKinney. (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
May 5, 2011 99 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc., HTC Corp., Mary McKinney. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 29, 2011 98 CLERKS NOTICE Resetting Motion Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 83 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT : Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 27, 2011 Pursuant to the Order Reassigning Case all hearings on motions and further deadlines terminated and must be renoticed in front of newly assigned Judge.
April 25, 2011 97 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge James Ware no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/25/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 21, 2011 96 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Continuing the Hearing Date for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re 93 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 83 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT: Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 18, 2011 95 Request for Judicial Notice re 84 Request for Judicial Notice Defendants Google Inc. and HTC Corporation's Reply in Support of Their Request for Judicial Notice filed byGoogle, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Related document(s) 84 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 94 REPLY (re 83 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Defendants Google Inc. and HTC Corporation's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byGoogle, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 15, 2011 93 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Continuing the Hearing Date for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Mary McKinney. (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 6, 2011 92 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Date for Filing Reply Brief re 90 Stipulation. Reply due 4/18/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 5, 2011 91 Declaration of FRANCE JAFFE in Support of 90 Stipulation STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Related document(s) 90 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 5, 2011 90 STIPULATION STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME by Google, Inc., HTC Corp., Mary McKinney. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 4, 2011 89 RESPONSE to re 84 Request for Judicial Notice Plaintiffs Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Mary McKinney. (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 88 RESPONSE (re 83 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byMary McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Avila, Sara) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 3, 2011 87 Certificate of Interested Entities by HTC Corp. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 22, 2011 86 Proposed Order re 83 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Google, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 22, 2011 85 Declaration of ROSEMARIE T. RING in Support of 84 Request for Judicial Notice Supporting Motion to Dismiss filed byGoogle, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 84 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 22, 2011 84 Request for Judicial Notice re 83 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGoogle, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 83 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 22, 2011 83 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Google, Inc., HTC Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 10, 2011 82 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 81 Stipulation. Response due 2/22/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/10/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 31, 2011 81 STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by HTC Corp.. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 14, 2011 80 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sara Dawn Avila (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 6, 2011 79 NOTICE by Mary McKinney Notice of Change of Firm Name (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 5, 2011 78 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/01/2010, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/26/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/7/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2011. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
December 20, 2010 77 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 76 Stipulation. Response due 1/31/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 17, 2010 76 STIPULATION STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Google, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 3, 2010 75 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Google, Inc., HTC Corp.. Filed byMary McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to Second Amended Complaint)(Avila, Sara) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
November 17, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 12/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 16, 2010 74 Interlocutory JUDGMENT. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant T-Mobile USA INC against Plaintiff Mary McKinney. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 16, 2010. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010) Modified on 11/17/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/17/2010 (x2)(ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2010 73 Featured Case ORDER Granting 30 T-Mobile's Motion to Compel Arbitration; Denying 36 T-Mobile's Motion to Dismiss; Denying 39 HTC's Motion to Compel Arbitration; Granting 41 Google and HTC's Motion to Dismiss. On or before December 3, 2010, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint consistent with the terms of this Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/16/2010. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010) Modified text on 11/17/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2010 72 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 71 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Mary McKinney. Motions terminated: 63 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Mary McKinney. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/5/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 4, 2010 71 NOTICE of withdrawal of 63 MOTION for leave to file second amended complaint by Mary McKinney (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 11/4/2010) Modified on 11/4/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2010 70 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 11/1/2010) re (39 in 5:10-cv-01177-JW) MOTION to Compel Arbitration And To Stay Claims, MOTION to Dismiss, (41 in 5:10-cv-01177-JW) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC. AND HTC CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTIN TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, (30 in 5:10-cv-01177-JW) MOTION to Compel Arbitration. The Court vacated the Case Management Conference. The Court to issue further Order following hearing on motions. The Court took the Motions under submission after oral argument. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/1/2010)
October 29, 2010 69 Featured Case ORDER Denying (68) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:10-cv-01177-JW. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 68 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Request To Participate In Initial Case Management Conference By Telephone filed by Mary McKinney. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 26, 2010 67 Featured Case ORDER Granting 66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adam Plant. Signed on 10/26/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/26/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 25, 2010 66 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Adam P. Plant ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008372.) filed by Mary McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 22, 2010 65 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. In light of the pending Motions, the Court finds good cause tocontinue the Conference to coincide with the hearing. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the 10/25/2010 Case Management Conference to 11/1/2010 10:00. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 21, 2010 64 SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc., HTC Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 10/21/2010) Modified text on 10/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2010 63 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Mary McKinney. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)(Avila, Sara) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 20, 2010 62 SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT to 61 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Mary McKinney. (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 10/20/2010) Modified on 10/21/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 61 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Google, Inc., HTC Corp., Mary McKinney, T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 61 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc., HTC Corp., Mary McKinney, T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 10/15/2010) Modified on 10/18/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings re 60 ORDER RELATING CASE : Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 60 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds that the cases are related within the meaning of Rule 3-12(a). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall immediately relate Nathan Nabors v. Google, Inc., Case No. 10-cv-03897-LHK to Mary McKinney v. Google, Inc., et al., Case No. 10-cv-01177-JW. The parties in both cases shall appear for a Case Management Conference on October 25, 2010 at 10 a.m. On or before October 15, 2010, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement. The Statement shall address whether the cases should be consolidated and if so, a schedule for nomination of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Related cases: Create association to 5:10-cv-03897-LHK. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/8/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 4, 2010 59 Declaration of Sara D. Avila In Support of Unopposed Administrative 59 Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Mary McKinney. (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010,(link) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 58 MOTION to Relate Case C10-1177 JW and C10-3897 HRL filed by Mary McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order)(Avila, Sara) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 57 RESPONSE to 50 objections to declarations filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Grant, James) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 56 REPLY in support of their 42 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Google, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event,) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 55 Reply Memorandum re 41 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; filed by Google, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 54 Reply in support of re 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Grant, James) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event,) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 53 Reply in support of re 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Claims filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Grant, James) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event,) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 52 Reply Memorandum In Support Of 39 Motion To Compel Arbitration And To Stay Claims filed by HTC Corp.. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 51 RESPONSE to re 42 Request for Judicial Notice, Plaintiffs Opposition to Request For Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants Google Inc. and HTC Corporations Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Mary McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying The Request for Judicial notice Filed By Defendants Google Inc and HTC Corp.)(Avila, Sara) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 50 OBJECTIONS to re 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Evidentiary Objections to Declarations Provided In Support of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss by Mary McKinney. (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 49 Memorandum in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. filed byMary McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Claims)(Avila, Sara) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 48 Memorandum in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And To Stay Claims; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byMary McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant HTC Corp.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Claims)(Avila, Sara) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 47 Memorandum in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. filed byMary McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc's Motion to Dismiss)(Avila, Sara) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 46 Memorandum in Opposition re 41 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC. AND HTC CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTIN TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byMary McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant Google Inc's Motion to Dismiss)(Avila, Sara) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 17, 2010 45 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiff to Oppose Defendants' Motions to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss; Extending time for Defendants to Reply re 44 Stipulation. Oppositions due 8/25/2010, Replies due 9/22/2010. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2010 at 9:00 AM remains as previously set. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 10, 2010 44 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to extend the deadline re 24 Stipulation and Order by Mary McKinney. (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 8/10/2010) Modified on 8/10/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2010 43 Proposed Order re 41 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Google, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 7/12/2010) Modified on 7/13/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2010 42 Request for Judicial Notice re 41 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Google, Inc., HTC Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 41 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 7/12/2010) Modified on 7/13/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2010 41 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC. AND HTC CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTIN TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Google, Inc., HTC Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 40 Declaration of Rosemarie T. Ring in Support of Defendants Google Inc. and HTC Corporations's 42 Request for Judicial Notice filed by HTC Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 7/12/2010) Modified on 7/13/2010,(link) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2010 39 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And MOTION To Stay Claims; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by HTC Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 7/12/2010) Modified on 7/13/2010,(counsel failed to properly select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2010 38 Brief re 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byT-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Related document(s) 36 ) (Grant, James) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 37 Proposed Order re 36 MOTION to Dismiss by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Grant, James) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Grant, James) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 35 Declaration of James C. Grant in Support of 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss filed byT-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Grant, James) (Filed on 7/12/2010) Modified on 7/12/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2010 34 Declaration of Rebekah Casner in Support of 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byT-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Grant, James) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 33 Declaration of Andrea Baca in Support of 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss filed byT-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 30 ) (Grant, James) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 32 Brief re 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Claims filed byT-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Grant, James) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 31 Proposed Order re 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Case by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Grant, James) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Grant, James) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
June 21, 2010 29 Featured Case ORDER Granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edith M. Kallas. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/21/2010.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 21, 2010 28 Featured Case ORDER Granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick J. Sheehan. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 21, 2010 27 Featured Case ORDER Granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joe R. Whatley, Jr. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 11, 2010 26 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., HTC Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Filed byMary McKinney. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 25 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc., HTC Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 24 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Continuance of Case Management Conference re 22 Stipulation Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2010. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 8, 2010 23 Declaration of MATTHEW L. LARRABEE in Support of 22 Stipulation STIPULATED REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE JUNE 21, 2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 8, 2010 22 STIPULATION STIPULATED REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE JUNE 21, 2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES by Google, Inc.. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
May 27, 2010 21 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT re 20 Stipulation. Amended Complaint due by 6/11/2010. Answer or Dispositive Motion due 7/12/2010. Anticipated Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The stipulated briefing schedule remains unchanged. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/27/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 21, 2010 20 STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Google, Inc., HTC Corp., Mary McKinney, T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 11, 2010 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edith M. Kallas ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007340.) filed by Mary McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick J. Sheehan ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007341.) filed by Mary McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joe R. Whatley, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007342.) filed by Mary McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
April 29, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Steven Keeley Taylor; Asim M. Bhansali and Paven Malhotra terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 2, 2010 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mary McKinney. Service waived by HTC Corp. waiver sent on 3/29/2010, answer due 5/28/2010. (Avila, Sara) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
March 29, 2010 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by HTC Corp.. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 26, 2010 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James C. Grant ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007060.) filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 25, 2010 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 03/25/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings:, ***Deadlines terminated. Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 24, 2010 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Google, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Taylor, Steven) (Filed on 3/24/2010) Modified on 3/25/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2010 6 Proof of Service re 1 Notice of Removal by Google, Inc (Malhotra, Paven) (Filed on 3/22/2010) Modified on 3/24/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2010 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Order for CAND Judges CM Standing Order 3-1-07.) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 4 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R> 3-16 adn Fed R.Civ P. 7.1 by Google, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by T-Mobile USA, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 2 Declaration of Steven K. Taylo in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal re 1 filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A TO Notice of Removal, # 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS) from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 110CV162678. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611007022). Filed BY Goggle, Inc, T-Mobile USA, iNC (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney v. Google, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McKinney
Represented By: Sara D Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Asim M. Bhansali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?