National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al v. Resource Development Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: Resource Development Services, Inc., James Lucero, Shelley Lucero, Aracelli Franco, Elvia Nenque, Joe Morse, Tom Overton, Richard Andrade, Jose Salvatier, Daniel Sanchez, Rudy Hernandez, Guillermo Ceballos, Randy Vargas, Valley Recycling, Randazzo Enterprises, Dominguez & Sons, Premier Recycling, Pacific Coast Recycling, Gibson's Resource Group, Cal Waste, Accurate Cleaning Systems, Alviso, A&S Metals, D&C Construction, JLV Equipment, DVBE Trucking, Nogalera Trucking, A&A Recycling, Bay Area Hauling Maintenance, Dependable Waste Solutions, Paramount Drywall, Rad Roll-Off, All Trash, Bay Cal Recycling, JM Hauling, Almaden Construction, Del Toro, Espinoza & Daughter Hauling, Martha Renteria and Affordable Roofing
Case Number: 5:2010cv01324
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 514 Motion for Sanctions and/or contempt without prejudice.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/11/2015. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/26/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 513 JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/22/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER RE 503 JONNA CORPORATION, INC. DBA PREMIER RECYCLE COMPANY'S REQUEST TO DISMISS REMAINDER OF CROSS-CLAIM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/10/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 501 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF JONNA CORPORATION, INC. DBA PREMIER RECYCLE COMPANY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/4/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER RE 474 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT A&S METALS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/27/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/26/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER RE 438 DISCONTINUANCE OF NOTICE OF RICHARD R. ROY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/17/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 408 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. REFERRING CASE to Private ADR Further Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/25/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 398 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 397 TO EXTEND TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/26/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER RE 395 WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/25/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 379 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 375 TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO VALLEY RECYCLING'S MOTION TO DISMISS PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED DATES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/20/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 365 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 364 EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT JONNA CORPORATION, INC., DBA PREMIER RECYCLE COMPANY TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/5/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFF NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA'S MOTION TO CONFIRM COMPLIANCE WITH DECEMBER 12, 2011 ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 29, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART REQUEST CONTINUING FEBRUARY 14, 2012 HEARING AND RELATED DATES re 346 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue February 14, 2012 Hearing and Related Dates filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 7, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER RE 341 GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/2/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER RE NATIONAL UNION'S LETTER DATED JANUARY 31, 2012 re 339 Letter filed by Dominguez & Sons. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 2, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER RE 336 Attorney Mario Alberto Moya terminated. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/27/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO CONFIRM COMPLIANCE WITH COURTS DECEMBER 12, 2011 DISCOVERY ORDER, re 326 Renotice motion hearing, filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 1/25/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER re 313 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/2/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER REGARDING PREMIER RECYCLE COMPANY'S TIME TO FILE A MOTION TO STRIKE GUILLERMO CEBALLOS' ANSWER TO PREMIER RECYCLE COMPANY'S CROSS-CLAIM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/17/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 263 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR CROSS-DEFENDANTS JAMES LUCERO AND RESOURCE DEVELOPMENT SERVICES, INC. TO RESPOND TO CROSS-CLAIMS re 244 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/11/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on August 12, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 242 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/10/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT JONNA CORPORATION, INC. DBA PREMIER RECYCLE COMPANY TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 211 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/20/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 184 MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on June 16, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AS TO ALL MOVING DEFENDANTS OTHER THAN JLV AND GRANTING MOTION AS TO JLV. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on May 17, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE re 194 Stipulation, filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 4, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER GRANTING 164 JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE MARCH 4, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DATE OF HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2011 is CONTINUED to 4/15/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/3/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' FILING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 150 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/7/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/16/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT A&S METALS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (approving 102 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/27/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT VALLEY RECYCLING'S MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying 69 Motion to Stay (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT A&S METALS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (approving 91 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/9/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying 65 Ex Parte Application (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS RESOURCE DEVELOPMENT SERVICES, INC. AND JAMES LUCERO TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (approving 67 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/13/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER BY JUDGE JERMEY FOGEL GRANTING 53 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE EITHER A "CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE," OR ELSE A "DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT." Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on May 7, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al v. Resource Development Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Ernest E Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resource Development Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aracelli Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvia Nenque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Salvatier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Ceballos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Recycling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randazzo Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominguez & Sons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Recycling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Coast Recycling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson's Resource Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal Waste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accurate Cleaning Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alviso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&S Metals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&C Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLV Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVBE Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nogalera Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&A Recycling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Hauling Maintenance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dependable Waste Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Drywall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rad Roll-Off
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Trash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Cal Recycling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM Hauling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Almaden Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Espinoza & Daughter Hauling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Renteria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable Roofing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?