Securities And Exchange Commission v. Bond
Plaintiff: Securities And Exchange Commission
Defendant: Stephen C Bond
Case Number: 5:2010cv01358
Filed: March 31, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER 41 to Take Case Management Conference Off-Calendar. 8/9/2013 CMC is Vacated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/7/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER 37 to Suspend Settlement Conference and Trial Date. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/9/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER 35 to Reschedule Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 5/17/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/16/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER 22 to Reschedule the Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/15/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER 10 Extending Time for Defendant Stephen C. Bond to Answer and Setting Case Management Conference Schedule: Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities And Exchange Commission v. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities And Exchange Commission
Represented By: Marc J. Fagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?