Feldman v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Barry Feldman
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv01433
Filed: April 5, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2010 10 Featured Case ORDER ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES; APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND LIAISON COUNSEL. The Court consolidates the Actions--CV 10-00672, CV 10-01433, and CV 10-02509--into one action. The Clerk of Court shall consolidate these actions such that the earliest filed action, CV 10-00672, is the lead case. All future filings shall be in CV 10-00672 and bear the caption: "In re Google Buzz Privacy Litigation." Since the later actions are now consumed in the first filed action, the Clerk shall administratively close CV 10-01433 and CV 10-02509. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motions terminated: (19 in 5:10-cv-00672-JW) MOTION for entry of [Proposed] Pretrial Order No. 1 MOTION for entry of [Proposed] Pretrial Order No. 1, ***CMC Deadlines terminated re (27 in 5:10-cv-00672-JW) Stipulation, (6 in 5:10-cv-01433-JW) Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/30/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010) Modified text on 6/30/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2010 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( 9 ). Case reassigned to Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 9 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall immediately relate Eva Hibnick, et al. v. Google, Inc., et al., Case No. CV 10-00672-JW and Barry Feldman, et al. v. Google, Inc., et al., Case No. CV 10-01433-HRL. Related cases: Create association to 5:10-cv-00672-JW. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/30/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 28, 2010 8 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the Court's unavailability, the Case Management Conference is continued from 07/27/2010 to 8/17/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement by 08/10/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 17, 2010 7 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 14, 2010 6 STIPULATION and Order RE: Relation and Consolidation of Cases by Barry Feldman. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 12, 2010 5 WAIVER OF the Service of Summons Executed filed by Barry Feldman. Service waived by Google, Inc. waiver sent on 6/10/2010, answer due 8/9/2010. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/12/2010) Modified on 6/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2010 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Eric David Freed (Freed, Eric) (Filed on 4/8/2010) Modified on 4/8/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 2 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611007118). Filed by Barry Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feldman v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Feldman
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?