Schott v. Ivy Asset Manageetn Corp et al
Plaintiff: Stephen C. Schott
Defendant: Ivy Asset Manageetn Corp and The Bank of New York Mellon Corp
Case Number: 5:2010cv01562
Filed: April 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 33 GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF STEVEN J. KAISER. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/23/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 26 GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY REASSIGNMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/13/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 22 JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND RENOTICING HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/6/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 Continuing Deadlines and Initial Case Management and Renoticing Hearing Date for Motion for Change of Venue. Initial case management conference and associated deadlines continued until further notice. Hearing re 10 defendants' motion to change venue continued to 9/14/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/17/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re Deadline for Consent or Declination to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. Consents or declinations due by 6/25/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/14/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 Modifying Deadlines by Which to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/11/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schott v. Ivy Asset Manageetn Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen C. Schott
Represented By: Anthony B. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Asset Manageetn Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?