Fernando et al v. eBay, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Devinda Fernando and Vadim Tsigel
Defendant: eBay, Inc. and Paypal, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv01668
Filed: April 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER TERMINATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (100 in 4:10-cv-01668-SBA, 135 in 4:10-cv-02500-SBA). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/28/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/25/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 122 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. ; denying 133 Motion to Intervene; denying 141 Motion to Continue; denying 143 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER re 153 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, Order on Motion to Continue,,,,,,,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/14/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER RE MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/16/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying (130) Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; denying (146) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying (147) Motion to Continue in case 4:10-cv-01668-SBA; denying (149) Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; denying (154) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying (155) Motion to Continue in case 4:10-cv-02500-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong in case 4:10-cv-01668-SBA; STRIKING 144 Motion to Enforce Judgment in case 4:10-cv-02500-SBA. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 05/01/13 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part and denying in part 109 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/20/2013 03:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 3/7/2013.. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 02/14/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying AS MOOT (73) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 4:10-cv-01668-SBA; denying AS MOOT (92) Stipulation in case 4:10-cv-02500-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG in case 4:10-cv-01668-SBA; denying (128) Motion for Reconsideration in case 4:10-cv-02500-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying (119) Motion REQUEST TO BE HEARD; denying (120) Motion for Hearing; denying (121) Motion to Intervene in case 4:10-cv-02500-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying (79) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:10-cv-01668-SBA; denying (97) Motion to Intervene; denying (112) Motion for Settlement; denying (114) Motion to Vacate in case 4:10-cv-02500-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (97 in 4:10-cv-02500-SBA) First MOTION to Intervene and for Stay. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/11/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (97 in 4:10-cv-02500-SBA) First MOTION to Intervene and for Stay. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re (90 in 4:10-cv-02500-SBA, 90 in 4:10-cv-02500-SBA) Order on Stipulation,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/12/12. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2012 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: 48 MOTION to Stay filed by Ira Gilman, Shaul Behr, Michail Zinger, Fred Rickel, Amy Rickel, Vadim Tsigel, Devinda Fernando, Lacy Reintsma, 51 STIPULATION Vacating Hearing Dates filed by P aypal, Inc., 40 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Ira Gilman, Shaul Behr, Michail Zinger, Fred Rickel, Amy Rickel, Vadim Tsigel, Devinda Fernando, Lacy Reintsma, 26 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paypal, Inc... Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/20/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RELATED CASE ORDER re 28 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/22/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (approving 24 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/2/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 21 . Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/10/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, TAKING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OFF CALENDAR AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT) (approving 19 ). The Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2011 is VACATED. The Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2011 is CONTINUED to 6/10/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/11/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS EBAY INC. AND PAYPAL, INCL TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT, CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 17 ). The Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2010 is CONTINUED to 1/28/2011 at 9:00 AM. The Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2010 is CONTINUED to 4/22/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/4/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/2/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernando et al v. eBay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devinda Fernando
Represented By: David K. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vadim Tsigel
Represented By: David K. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paypal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?