Golden Bear Insurance Company v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Golden Bear Insurance Company
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2010cv01672
Filed: April 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall close the file and terminate any pending motions. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/30/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall close the file and terminate any pending motions. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/2/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re 74 Denying Request to Change Time. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/1/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 47 Approving Stipulation for Amended Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/25/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Setting Hearing and Briefing Schedule re 26 and 31 motions for summary judgment. The hearing on both motions is set for 5/26/2011 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. A Case Management Conference will follow the hearing on 5/26/2011. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/11/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/2/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 Proposed Order filed by Lexington Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/18/10. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE re 20 Proposed Order filed by Golden Bear Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/15/10. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 12 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/13/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 10 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (as modified by the Court). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/12/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Bear Insurance Company v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Bear Insurance Company
Represented By: Henry Ming-Cheng Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Eric Inbody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?