Sisters of Notre Dame DeNamur California Province v. Mrs. Owen J. Garnett-Murrary et al
Plaintiff: |
Sisters of Notre Dame DeNamur California Province |
Defendant: |
Mrs. Owen J. Garnett-Murrary and Manlei Chiao |
Case Number: |
5:2010cv01807 |
Filed: |
April 27, 2010 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
Santa Clara |
Presiding Judge: |
Howard R. Lloyd |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
Environmental Matters |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 17, 2012 |
Filing
117
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/18/2012 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/11/2012. All pending deadlines and motions have been vacated. July 24, 2012 Pretrial conference is vacated. July 30, 2012 trial is vacated. Motions terminated: 114 MOTION in Limine to Bifurcate Cross-Claims filed by Manlei Chiao, 108 MOTION in Limine to Limit Defendants' Expert Opinion Testimony filed by Sisters of Notre Dame DeNamur California Province. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/17/12. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
|
July 11, 2012 |
Filing
111
ORDER excusing Mrs. Murray's attendance at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/11/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
|
June 6, 2012 |
Filing
99
ORDER RE: PARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 80 87 by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/6/2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
|
May 20, 2011 |
Filing
69
ORDER (1) GRANTING 57 Technichem's motion to dismiss second cause of action in First Amended Third Party Complaint, (2) GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 59 Tabatabai and Fesahati's motion to dismiss second and third causes of action in First Amended Third Party Complaint, and (3) DENYING 62 Tabatabai and Fesahati's motion to dismiss cross-claims. The May 24, 2011 hearing is VACATED. 58 Tabatabai and Fesahati's motion to join is DENIED AS MOOT. 68 Garnett-Murray and Fremont Corners' motion to appear by telephone is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/20/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
|
February 24, 2011 |
Filing
52
ORDER GRANTING 33 and 35 Third Party Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Third Party Complaint. Third Party Plaintiffs may file an amended third party complaint within 14 days from the date of this order. Further, because 34 is identical to 33 , 34 will be terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/24/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
|
December 7, 2010 |
Filing
30
ORDER VACATING DEADLINES AND DATES AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Another Further Case Management Conference is set for February 8, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, San Jose, to set discovery, dispositive motions, pre-trial, and trial dates in this case. A further joint case management statement shall be due by February 1, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/7/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?