Leeder v. Secretary of Defense, Robert M. Gates, Department of Defense
Plaintiff: Sue A Leeder
Defendant: Secretary of Defense, Robert M. Gates, Department of Defense
Case Number: 5:2010cv01822
Filed: April 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 87 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #2. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re 78 (1) granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents and (2) denying plaintiff's request for sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/18/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 56 defendant's Motion for Protective Order.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 53 Extending Mediation Deadline. Deadline for mediation: 7/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/2/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER (1) Vacating Referral to Federal Pro Bono Project; (2) Continuing Stay of Action; and (3) Setting Case Management Conference. Stay of proceedings to continue through 2/24/2011. Case management conference set for 4/5/2011, 1:30 PM. Joint case management statement due by 3/29/2011. All other related deadlines adjusted accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/1/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re 26 Terminating Assignment to the Assisted Settlement Conference Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/7/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Setting Further Case Management Conference. Further case management conference set for 12/7/2010, 1:30 PM. Joint status report due by 11/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/24/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 Continuing Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Case management conference continued to 8/24/2010, 1:30 PM. Related deadlines adjusted accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/22/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leeder v. Secretary of Defense, Robert M. Gates, Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue A Leeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Defense, Robert M. Gates, Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?